CONVERY v. MCGINLEY et al
Petitioner: ROBERT CONVERY, JR.
Respondent: TOM MCGINLEY, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF BERKS and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 5:2022cv02346
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Referring Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
2 Judge: LYNNE A SITARSKI
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT RESPONDENTS' FIRST MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER TO PETITIONER'S WRIT OF HABEAS CORUS PETITION IS GRANTED. RESPONDENTS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE NO LATER 9/7/22. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 8/5/22. 8/5/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
August 4, 2022 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Order for Prisoner State Record, filed by THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF BERKS.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to LYNNE A. SITARSKI.(KELECIC, KENNETH)
August 4, 2022 Filing 9 Praecipe to enter appearance with certificate of service by THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF BERKS. (KELECIC, KENNETH) Modified on 8/5/2022 (fb).
August 2, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ROBERT CONVERY, JR re #7 Memorandum in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (SODOMSKY, ALLAN)
August 2, 2022 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by ROBERT CONVERY, JR. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (SODOMSKY, ALLAN)
July 21, 2022 Filing 6 Signed Receipt of State Court Record on 7/19/22, sent from DEPUTY CLERK; CLERKS OFFICE to THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI. (bw) Modified on 7/22/2022 (bw).
July 18, 2022 State Court Record received. (rf, )
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE DA OF BERKS COUNTY SHALL FILE SPECIFIC AND DETAILED ANSWERS BY 8/8/22. THE PROTHONOTARY OF BERKS COUNTY/CLERK OF COURTS OR OFFICE OF JUDICIAL SUPPORT OF BERKS COUNTY SHALL FILE THE CLERK OF THIS COURT COPIES OF ALL RECORDS, ETC IN THE MATTER OF COMMONWEALTH V. ROBERT CONVERY, JR., CP-06-CR-0005271-2015, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF BERKS COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA BY 8/8/22. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 6/24/22. 6/24/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
June 24, 2022 A COPY OF THE PETITION #1 AND ORDER #5 FORWARDED TO THE DA OF BERKS COUNTY AND THE PA ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE (mbh)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE A COPY OF THE PETITION TO THE DA OF BERKS COUNTY AND THE PA ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/23/22. 6/23/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
June 23, 2022 A COPY OF THE PETITION AND ORDER #4 FORWARDED TO THE DA OF BERKS COUNTY AND THE PA ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE. (mbh)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER TO HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/22/22. 6/22/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (er)
June 22, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by LOUIS T. SAVINO, JR on behalf of ROBERT CONVERY, JR (SAVINO, LOUIS)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number PPE240958.), filed by ROBERT CONVERY, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 RECEIPT)(er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONVERY v. MCGINLEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROBERT CONVERY, JR.
Represented By: ALLAN L. SODOMSKY
Represented By: LOUIS T. SAVINO, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TOM MCGINLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF BERKS
Represented By: KENNETH WILLIAM KELECIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?