WESLEY v. PRIME CARE MEDICAL et al
Plaintiff: BRIAN KEVIN WESLEY
Defendant: PRIME CARE MEDICAL, CHERYL STEBERGER and UNKOWN DOCTORS
Case Number: 5:2022cv04223
Filed: October 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by BRIAN KEVIN WESLEY. Envelope. (va)
November 21, 2022 Filing 9 Signature Page for MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by BRIAN KEVIN WESLEY. Envelope. (va)
November 21, 2022 Filing 8 Letter re: Prison Medical Offices, etc, by BRIAN KEVIN WESLEY. Envelope. (va)
October 31, 2022 Copies of order (Doc. #5 ) and prisoner in forma pauperis form mailed to plaintiff. (fb)
October 28, 2022 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against PRIME CARE MEDICAL, CHERYL STEBERGER, UNKOWN DOCTORS, (ADDITIONAL PAGES) filed by BRIAN KEVIN WESLEY.(bw)
October 28, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (ADDITIONAL PAGES) filed by BRIAN KEVIN WESLEY.(bw)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT IF MR. WESLEY SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION HE MUST, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER (1) PAY $402 (COMPRISING THE $350 FILING FEE AND $52 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (2) FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED INFORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT (OR INSTITUTIONAL EQUIVALENT) SHOWING ALL DEPOSITS, WITHDRAWALS, AND A CURRENT BALANCE, FROM ANY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY IN WHICH HE WAS CONFINED FOR THE SIX-MONTH PERIOD FROM APRIL 10, 2022 TO OCTOBER 10, 2022, REFLECTING ACCOUNT ACTIVITY FROM THAT TIME PERIOD. IF MR. WESLEY IS ULTIMATELY GRANTED LEAVE TO PROCEED INFORMA PAUPERIS, HE WILL BE OBLIGATED TO PAY THE $350 FILING FEE IN INSTALLMENTS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(B), EVEN IF HIS CASE IS DISMISSED; AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/25/22. 10/28/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(bw)
October 20, 2022 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (mas)
October 20, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Appointment of Counsel filed by BRIAN KEVIN WESLEY. (mas) Modified on 10/24/2022 (mas).
October 20, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against PRIME CARE MEDICAL, CHERYL STEBERGER, UNKOWN DOCTORS, filed by BRIAN KEVIN WESLEY. Envelope included. Fee not paid. IFP filed. Marshals Process Receipt and Return Form included. (Attachments: #1 FORM)(mas)
October 20, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY BRIAN KEVIN WESLEY.ENVELOPE INCLUDED.(mas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESLEY v. PRIME CARE MEDICAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN KEVIN WESLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME CARE MEDICAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERYL STEBERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKOWN DOCTORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?