BEADY v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: BRIAN BEADY
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Case Number: 5:2022cv04271
Filed: October 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: RICHARD A LLORET
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2022 Filing 5 Social Security Administrative Record . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Court transcript index, #2 Appendix Documents related to administrative process including transcript of oral hearing, if applicable, #3 Appendix Payment documents and decisions, #4 Appendix Jurisdictional documents and notices, #5 Appendix Non disability related development, #6 Appendix Disability related development, #7 Appendix Medical Records, Part 1, #8 Appendix Part 2, #9 Appendix Part 3, #10 Appendix Part 4, #11 Appendix Part 5)(LYNCH, ANDREW)
October 31, 2022 Filing 4 Social Security Magistrate Consent by BRIAN BEADY.. (CHERMOL, DAVID)
October 28, 2022 Filing 3 Procedural Order together with Supplemental Orders Entered and copies e-mailed. (mas)
October 28, 2022 Filing 2 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 consent)(mas) . (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/28/2022) (mas). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/28/2022) (mas). Modified on 10/28/2022 (mas).
October 28, 2022 Summons issued electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Acceptance of Service Agreement dated July 6, 2020. (mas)
October 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16268878.), filed by BRIAN BEADY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(CHERMOL, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEADY v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN BEADY
Represented By: DAVID F. CHERMOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Represented By: ANDREW C. LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?