IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF BRUCE VANDERHOEF, AS THE OWNER OF A 2005 BRYANT 214, HIN BRA21W38G405, FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY
In Re: IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF BRUCE VANDERHOEF, AS THE OWNER OF A 2005 BRYANT 214, HIN BRA21W38G405, FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY
Case Number: 5:2022cv04985
Filed: December 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KELLEY BRISBON HODGE
Referring Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH TO HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/6/23. 2/6/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ACCEPTING SECURITY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 1/12/23.1/12/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF CHRISTOPHER A. ABEL, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT, IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 1/10/23. 1/10/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
January 4, 2023 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher A. Abel by IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF BRUCE VANDERHOEF, AS THE OWNER OF A 2005 BRYANT 214, HIN BRA21W38G405, FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16408566.). (Stauffer, Jennifer)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOREXONERATION FROM OF LIMITATION OF LIABILITY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 12/21/22. 12/21/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF PUBLICATION AND STAY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 12/21/22. 12/21/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
December 21, 2022 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH: Telephone Conference held on 12/21/22. Court Reporter: None. (er)
December 21, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF BRUCE VANDERHOEF, AS THE OWNER OF A 2005 BRYANT 214, HIN BRA21W38G405, FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY (Stauffer, Jennifer)
December 21, 2022 Filing 9 Proposed Order filed by IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF BRUCE VANDERHOEF, AS THE OWNER OF A 2005 BRYANT 214, HIN BRA21W38G405, FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY..(Stauffer, Jennifer) Modified on 12/22/2022 (dt). Modified on 12/22/2022 (tjd).
December 16, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE Please be advised that Judge Smith has scheduled a telephone conference with respect to the above subject matter, for WEDNESDAY, DECEMBER 21, 2022, at 1:30 p.m. All counsel of record shall call 866-434-5269 and use pin 3623011# to enter the conference call.(sres)
December 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE by IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF BRUCE VANDERHOEF, AS THE OWNER OF A 2005 BRYANT 214, HIN BRA21W38G405, FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY (Stauffer, Jennifer)
December 15, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF BRUCE VANDERHOEF, AS THE OWNER OF A 2005 BRYANT 214, HIN BRA21W38G405, FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY (Stauffer, Jennifer)
December 15, 2022 Filing 5 Praecipe to Attach Exhibit to the Complaint by IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF BRUCE VANDERHOEF, AS THE OWNER OF A 2005 BRYANT 214, HIN BRA21W38G405, FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Stauffer, Jennifer)
December 15, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Approval Security and for Publication and Stay filed by IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF BRUCE VANDERHOEF, AS THE OWNER OF A 2005 BRYANT 214, HIN BRA21W38G405, FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Accepting Security, #2 Exhibit Order of Publication and Stay, #3 Exhibit Notrice of Complaint for Exoneration From of Limitation of Liability)(Stauffer, Jennifer)
December 15, 2022 Filing 3 STIPULATION Limitation Plaintiff's Stipulation for Costs by BRUCE VANDERHOEF. (Stauffer, Jennifer)
December 15, 2022 Filing 2 STIPULATION Limitation Plaintiff's Ad Interim Stipulation for Value by BRUCE VANDERHOEF. (Stauffer, Jennifer)
December 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRUCE VANDERHOEF (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16374559), filed by BRUCE VANDERHOEF. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(Stauffer, Jennifer) Modified on 12/15/2022 (sbt).
December 15, 2022 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED Designation Form in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Related Case section is incomplete. A signature is required. (sbt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF BRUCE VANDERHOEF, AS THE OWNER OF A 2005 BRYANT 214, HIN BRA21W38G405, FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF BRUCE VANDERHOEF, AS THE OWNER OF A 2005 BRYANT 214, HIN BRA21W38G405, FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY
Represented By: Jennifer L. Stauffer
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. ABEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?