IRIZARRY-INGLES v. RANSOM et al
Petitioner: ERIC IRIZARRY-INGLES
Respondent: SUP'T KEVIN J. RANSOM, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF LEHIGH and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 5:2022cv05191
Filed: December 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: RICHARD A LLORET
Referring Judge: EDWARD G SMITH
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH R. STAUFFER on behalf of THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF LEHIGH with Certificate of Service(STAUFFER, JOSEPH)
February 6, 2023 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #8 TO PETITIONER ON 2/6/23. (jaa, )
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE LEHIGH COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE SHALL ENTER THEIR APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF THE RESPONDENTS UPON RECEIPT OF THIS ORDER. THE CLERK FOR THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF LEHIGH COUNTY SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF THIS COURT COPIES OF ALL RECORDS, INCLUDING TRANSCRIPTS OF NOTES OF TESTIMONY AT ARRAIGNMENT, TRIAL, SENTENCING, SUPPRESSION HEARINGS, POST CONVICTION HEARINGS, PETITIONS, PLEADINGS, OPINIONS AND BRIEFS OF STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS IN THE MATTER OF COMMONWEALTH V. IRIZARRY-INGLES, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF LEHIGH COUNTY,CP-39-CR-0000122-2008 WITHIN 45 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 2/3/23. 2/3/23 ENTERED. NOT MAILED TO IRIZARRY-INGLES.(fdc)
February 3, 2023 Habeas Corpus Petition (#2), Order (#8) and Docket Report E-mailed to Lehigh County D.A's Office, CCP Lehigh County, PA Attorney General's Office. (fdc)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF 2/2/23 THAT PRO SE PETITIONER HAVING REMITED THE $5 FILING FEE (SEE DOC 6) ACCORDINGLY IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE RICHARD A. LLORET, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO PROVIDE A COPY OF THE HABEAS PETITION (DOC. 2) AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW (DOC. 3) TO LEHIGH COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE AND PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL CRIMINAL LAW DIVISION AND THE CLERK SHALL PLACE THIS MATTER INTO CIVIL SUSPENSE UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: EDWARD G. SMITH ON 2/2/23. 2/2/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER. (DT) Modified on 2/3/2023 (dt).
February 2, 2023 Habeas Corpus Petition (doc 2) and Memorandum in support (doc3) and Order referring case to magistrate Lloret (doc 7) and Docket entries e-mailed to Lehigh County District Attorney's Office and Attorney General Of pa. (dt)
February 2, 2023 Copy of Petition for habeas corpus (doc 2), Memorandum in Support (doc. 3), Order referring case to magistrate Lloret (doc. 7) and docket sheet e-mailed to Joseph R. Stauffer, Esq. (DT)
January 23, 2023 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 20005952 SCI-DALLAS (jaa, )
January 12, 2023 PAPER #4 ALONG WITH FORMS MAILED TO PRO SE (JL)
January 12, 2023 PRO SE GUIDELINES MAILED TO PRO SE (rf, )
January 11, 2023 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES.(md)
January 9, 2023 Copy of order #4 mailed to ERIC IRIZARRY-INGLES. (afm)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PETITIONER HAVING SUBMITTED A PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS 2254 WITHOUT EITHER PAYING THE FEE OR FILING A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, A BLANK COPY OF THE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ALONG WITH THIS ORDER WILL BE MAILED TO PETITIONER. PETITIONER MUST WITHIN 30 DAYS PAY THE REQUIRED $5 FILING FEE OR COMPLETE AND RETURN THE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT. IF PETITIONER FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THE PETITION MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/6/2023. 1/6/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg)
December 22, 2022 Filing 3 Memorandum of Law in Support filed by ERIC IRIZARRY-INGLES. (mas)
December 22, 2022 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ERIC IRIZARRY-INGLES. NOT FEE PAID. NO IFP FILED. ENVELOPE INCLUDED. (mas)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE FORM 3RD CIRCUIT (mas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IRIZARRY-INGLES v. RANSOM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ERIC IRIZARRY-INGLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SUP'T KEVIN J. RANSOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF LEHIGH
Represented By: JOSEPH R. STAUFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?