MERCER-SPENCER v. SPENCER et al
Plaintiff: DEBRA M. MERCER-SPENCER
Defendant: NATHANIL BRONDON SPENCER, SR., BERKS COUNTY JAIL SYSTEMS and THE ARRESTING OFFICER
Case Number: 5:2024cv00834
Filed: February 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M GALLAGHER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2024 Documents 5 & 6 Mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff Debra M. Mercer-Spencer. (dt) (copies also left here 504 Hamilton Street, Suite 1601, Allentown, Pa., for Plaintiff per order)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED IN PART WITH PREJUDICE AND DISMISSED IN PART WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR THE REASONS IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM, ETC. MERCER-SPENCER MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER ONLY AS TO THOSE CLAIMS THAT HAVE BEEN DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. UPON THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, THE CLERK SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED BY THE COURT. IN ACCORDANCE WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5(B)(2)(D), THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO LEAVE COPIES OF THE FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS FOR MERCER-SPENCER WITH THE CLERK'S OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, EDWARD N. CAHN U.S. COURTHOUSE, 504 W. HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA 18101: (1) A COPY OF THIS ORDER; (2) A COPY OF THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM; AND (3) A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD FORM TO BE USED BY A SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT FILING A CIVIL ACTION BEARING THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 4/19/24. 4/19/24 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO PRO SE) (er) Modified on 4/19/2024 (er).
April 19, 2024 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 4/19/24. 4/19/24 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO PRO SE) (er)
March 12, 2024 Filing 4 Copy of Order/Notice dated 2/27/24 (Document # 3) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to DEBRA MERCER - SPENCER for the following reason: RETURN TO SENDER - UNABLE TO FORWARD. (er) Modified on 3/14/2024 (er).
February 27, 2024 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (MAILED TO PRO SE) (er)
February 26, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against BERKS COUNTY JAIL SYSTEMS, NATHANIL BRONDON SPENCER, SR, THE ARRESTING OFFICER, filed by DEBRA M. MERCER-SPENCER (IFP PENDING). (er) Modified on 2/27/2024 (er).
February 26, 2024 Filing 1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by DEBRA M. MERCER-SPENCER. (er) Modified on 2/27/2024 (er).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERCER-SPENCER v. SPENCER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA M. MERCER-SPENCER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATHANIL BRONDON SPENCER, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERKS COUNTY JAIL SYSTEMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ARRESTING OFFICER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?