HERR v. LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON
Plaintiff: CAILEN HERR
Defendant: LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON
Case Number: 5:2024cv06686
Filed: December 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KELLEY BRISBON HODGE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2025 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by CAILEN HERR. (envelope attached) (dt)
December 18, 2024 DOC. NO. 4 MAILED TO PRO SE ON 12/18/2024. (md)
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HAVING FAILED TO FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF THE PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT, AS REQUIRED, PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS CANNOT BE ADJUDICATED AT THIS TIME. PLAINTIFF SHALL, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF THE PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT. ALTERNATIVELY PLAINTIFF CAN PROCEED BY SUBMITTING $405 TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THE CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 12/17/24. 12/17/24 ENTERED. (COPY NOT MAILED TO PRO SE)(dt)
December 17, 2024 DOC. 3 MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg)
December 16, 2024 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (NOT MAILED TO PRO SE). (er)
December 13, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON, filed by CAILEN HERR (ENVELOPE ATTACHED).(er) Modified on 12/16/2024 (er).
December 13, 2024 Filing 1 APPLICATION FOR PRISONERS TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by CAILEN HERR (ENVELOPE ATTACHED). (er) Modified on 12/16/2024 (er).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERR v. LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAILEN HERR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?