SANCHEZ v. BUTTERWORTH et al
Plaintiff: VINCENT J. SANCHEZ
Defendant: RUSHIN, BUTTERWORTH and UNKNOWN C.O.'S NAMES WHILE IN SEGREGATION
Case Number: 5:2024cv06884
Filed: December 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2025 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by PRO SE PLAINTIFF VINCENT J. SANCHEZ. (ENVELOPE ATTACHED) (DT)
January 31, 2025 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF VINCENT J. SANCHEZ FOR PRISONERS TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. (ENVELOPE ATTACHED) (DT)
January 30, 2025 Filing 7 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME filed by VINCENT J. SANCHEZ..(bw)
January 21, 2025 Filing 6 Letter dated 1/14/25 by VINCENT J. SANCHEZ (envelope). (er)
January 15, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL #2 IS DENIED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 1/15/25.1/16/25 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(bw)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HAVING SUBMITTED COMPLAINT WITH THE COURT WITHOUT EITHER PAYING THE FEES TO COMMENCE A CIVIL ACTION OR FILING A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, PLAINTIFF MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY $405 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF THE PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THE CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/2/25. 1/2/25 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, WITH IFP APPLICATION.(er)
December 26, 2024 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES. (mas)
December 26, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by VINCENT J. SANCHEZ..(mas)
December 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BUTTERWORTH, RUSHIN, UNKNOWN C.O.'S NAMES WHILE IN SEGREGATION, filed by VINCENT J. SANCHEZ. NO FEE, NO IFP. (mas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/31/2024: #1 Exhibit) (mas). Modified on 1/2/2025 (lisad, ).
December 26, 2024 Copy of Doc. 3 mailed to Pro Se. (mas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANCHEZ v. BUTTERWORTH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUTTERWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN C.O.'S NAMES WHILE IN SEGREGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT J. SANCHEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?