Scott v. Lackey, et al
Case Number: 1:2002cv01586
Filed: September 9, 2002
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER denying plaintiff's motion to vacate judgment 490 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/11/13. (ki)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER dismissing plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 475 for want of jurisdiction. (See oder for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 3/08/13. (ki)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER denying Scott's motion for a new trial 458 & Scott's motion to alter or amend judgment entered in favor of Evan Adams 456 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 08/15/12. (ki)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER denying Wellington's motion req'ng protective order & that Scott be req'd to provide final exhibit list 423 , overruling Wellington's objections to Scott's trial exhibits 411 , denying Scott's motion to determine sufficiency of Wellington's answers to pltf's RFAs 419 & directing that all other pending motions, objs, & corrs pending before the ct will be resolved @ trial. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 07/03/12. (ki)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 429 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Scott's motion for reconsideration 404 & denying Scott's motion to strike 420 as moot. (See memo & order for complete details.)Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 06/27/12. (ki)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER denying Scott's motion to continue trial date 388 , denying Scott's motion for sanctions against deft Wellington 390 , & denying Scott's letter request for expedited briefing 401 as moot. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 06/07/12. (ki)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 382 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: MILS 372 & 373 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Scott's MIL 373 denied w/out prejudice to rt of Scott to object @ trial to any evidence she believes to be improperly authenticated or otherwise inadmissible.; 2. Wellington's MIL 372 denied w/out prejudice to rt of Wellington to object @ trial to any evidence she believes is inadmissible. (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 05/29/12. (ki)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying motion for entry of judgment 359 , denying motion to dismiss 363 , dismissing motion to strike 366 as MOOT, & noting revised scheduling order setting PTC & trial date to issue. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 03/23/12. (ki)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the motion 347 to vacate the court's order granting deft Adams' summary jdgmt motion under Rule 59 is CONSTRUED as a motion for reconsideration & is DENIED as so construed. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 07/20/10. (ki)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The report & recommendation of the magistrate judge 336 is REJECTED.; 2. Adams' motion fo summary jdgmt 302 is GRANTED.; 3. Clrk of Ct directed to defer entry of judgment on these claims in favor of deft Evan Adams & against pltf Teresa Anne Scott until the resolution of all claims. (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 01/20/10. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Lackey, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?