CG et al v. The Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Department of Education et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv01523
Filed: August 4, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act of 1990
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court finds in favor of Dfts on all remaining claims. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Dfts and CLOSE the case. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on Aug. 23, 2012. (sc)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MEMORANDUM and ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Pltf's 194 225 Mtns to Exclude Dr. Gottlieb's testimony are GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on Aug. 16, 2011. (sc)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 109 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Dfts 110 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to a)Pltf's Rehab Act and ADA clms against Dft Zahorchak; b)Pltf's Substantive Due Process Clm against both Dft Dept of Education and Dft Zahorchak. Dfts mtn for sumjgm is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on Jan. 28, 2011. SEE ORDER. (sc)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 159 Motion to Strike Dr. O'Malley's expert report is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on Nov. 8, 2010. SEE ORDER. (sc)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 155 MOTION to Strike Paragraphs 3 and 6 of Declaration of L.C., Pl. Ex. Z and Z-1 filed by The Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Department of Education, Gerald Zahorchak is GRANTED. Paragraphs three and six of Pltf's Exh Z 109 and Plaintiffs Amendment Exhibit Z-1 are HEREBY STRICKEN. 163 Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on July 2, 2010. SEE MEMORANDUM FOR DETAILS. (sc)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 13 Motion to Certify Class is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. A First Class of Pltfs consisting of special needs students attending PA School Districts which have a 17% or higher enrolle d population of special needs students and a market value/personal income ratio of.65 or greater is CERTIFIED, as well as a Second Class of LEP special needs students which have a 10% or greater population of LEP students. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on Sept. 29, 2009. (sc)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER; The Court adopts, in part, the 3rd alternative remedy proposed by defts and directs defts' representatives within 5 days of the date of this order, to personally go to the office of plfs' cn and to retrieve all of the inadvertently p roduced information, and any copies thereof, and to destroy this information at defts' expense. The court also directs defts to deliver to plfs, within l0 days of the date of this order, at defts' expense, the redacted form all of the PennD ata information plfs have requested in their 3rd Set of Requests and further directs defts to pay atty fees to cn for plfs for her time related only to the filing of plfs' Doc 92 letter brief. Cn for plfs, is directed to provide defts with an Af fidavit as to her stated time and customary rate related to the filing of plfs' Doc. 92 letter brief within 5 days of the date of this Order. SO ORDERED. (See order for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Blewitt on 3/16/09. (jb, )
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants' 32 Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED. Pltf's G.J.'s claims are DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. Pltf's shall be permitted to file a mtn for leave to amend their amd cmpt no later than 10 days from the date of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on Nov. 3, 2008. SEE ORDER. (sc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CG et al v. The Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?