Mincy v. Klem et al
Plaintiff: Hilton Karriem Mincy
Defendant: Edward Klem, Jeffrey Beard and Marilyn Brooks
Case Number: 1:2007cv00790
Filed: April 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Presiding Judge: PRSLC
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER denying pltf's motion for reconsideration or reargument 204 of this Distric Court's order 202 & pltf's motion for depositions pending appeal 213 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 08/30/12. (ki)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying pltf's motion for partial summary jdgmt 80 , GRANTING defts' MSJ 150 , directing Clrk of Ct to enter judgment in favor of defts & against pltf, denying pltf's motion for sanctions 196 , motion to amend complaint 198 & motion to stay ruling on MSJ 200 , & directing Clrk of Ct to CLOSE case. (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 03/06/12. (ki)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER denying defts' motion to strike 171 & pltf's motion to strike 173 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 01/30/12. (ki)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER deeming defts' motion to vacate 186 WITHDRAWN for failure to file a br in support, directing defts to comply w/ ct's 11/30/11 order 179 by 2/10/12, directing that notice of compliance with 11/30/11 order 179 to be filed w/ the court by 2/10/12, & DENYING pltf's motion for sanctions 187 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 01/27/12. (ki)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER deeming pltf's motion for reconsideration 181 WITHDRAWN for failure to file br in supp, DENYING pltf's motion 182 to strike orig complaint & replace it w/ amended complaint..., & DENYING pltf's motion 184 to expedite ruling on discovery motions 140 & 151 as MOOT... (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 01/26/12. (ki)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting motion for reconsideration 140 to extent that defts Vance, Wetzel & Murphy shall respond to pltf's requests for admissions..., GRANTING pltf's motion to compel 151 to extent that deft Gavin shall provide to pltf by 12/15/ 11 names/locations of "state correctional institutions in Dept's Eastern & Central Regions prisons" to which inmates from whom pltf was admin separated were confined, directing defts to file notice of compliance w/ Court by 12/15/11, & noting no exts of time will be granted absent exigent circumstances. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/30/11. (ki)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that - 1. Order of 10/11/11 163 VACATED, pltf's mot for recon 168 DENIED & pltf's mot seeking sanctions 169 DENIED.; 2. Pltf's mot to amend 127 2nd amend complain DENIED.; 3. Pltf's mot to reopen discovery 153 w/ re: CMM DENIED.; 4. Pltf's motion to strike 156 defts' br in opp to mot for leave to amend & disc mots DENIED. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/22/11. (ki)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Pltf's motion 127 to amend 2nd amended complaint to substitute name of party is GRANTED.; 2. Pltf's motion to reopen discovery 153 to allow pltf to pursue discovery w/ re: CMM GRANTED in part & DENIED in part... (see Paras 2a & 2b for specific instructions & limitations re: same). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/11/11. (ki)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER denying plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction 147 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/05/11. (ki)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Defts' MSJ 57 DENIED w/out prejudice to refile motion by 9/16/11.; 2. Pltf's motion to stay disposition of defts' MSJ 114 DENIED as MOOT.; 3. Defts' motion for ext of time to coplay w/ ct& #039;s order re: discovery responses 129 GRANTED... (see order for specific instructions.; 4. Pltf's motion to compel production of docs or for sanctions 130 GRANTED in part & DENIED in part... (see Paras 4a & 4b for specifics).; 5. Pltf's motion to reopen discovery period 117 GRANTED in part & DENIED in part... (see Paras 5a & 5b for specifics). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 07/29/11. (ki)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER denying plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 110 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 07/07/11. (ki)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's motion to compel answers to interrogatories 94 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 06/14/11. (ki)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting defts' motions 91 & 92 for ext of time to serve opposition briefs to pltf's motion for partial summ jdgmt & pltf's motion for sanctions or to compel discovery until 5/2/2011 & denying pltf's motion 89 to strike defts' motion for ext of time. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 04/21/11. (ki)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying pltf's motion for sanctions 71 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 04/05/11. (ki)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER deeming pltf's motion to compel 47 as unopposed & GRANTING same & directing defts to respond to pltf's interrogatories by 12/1/10 & shall file certificate of compliance w/ the court. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/17/10. (ki)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re: pltf's proposed 2nd amended complaint 38 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Prop 2nd amended complain 38 STRICKEN & Clrk of Ct shall return doc to pltf.; 2. Clrk of Ct directed to fwd to pltf another civil rts form complaint. ; 3. Plt f may file 2nd amended complaint in acc w/ prior memo & order 36 by 4/22/10...; 4. 2nd amended complaint limited to existing claims re: Vance, Gower, Wetzel & Murphy... (see order for specific instructions).; 5. Amended complaint to be short, plain , concise... (see order for specific instructions).; 6. Failure to comply will result in dismissl of retaliatory theft of property, destruction of property & transfer claims. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 04/08/10. (ki)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM & ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Motion to dismiss 31 is GRANTED in part & DENIED in part.; 2. Motion granted w/ re: request for injunctive relief & conspiracy & destruction of property claims.; 3. Motion denied w/ re: retaliation claims.; 4. Defts Vance, Gower, Murphy & Wetzel shall file answer to complaint by 3/5/10.; 5. Clrk of Ct to fwd pltf a civil rts form complaint.; 6. Pltf may file 2nd amended complaint in acc w/ this memo by 3/29/10...; 7. Amended complaint to be sh ort, plain & concise stmt of retailiation clamis & be a new pleading...; 8. The only claims inc in 2nd amended complaint are claims that defts Vance, Gower, Wetzel & Murphy issued him retaliatory misconducts...; 9. Failure to comply w/ this order wil l result in dismissal of retaliatory theft of property, destruction of property & transfer claims.; 10. Pltf's motion for indefinite ext of time 35 DENIED however pltf afforded liberal time of 45 days to file 2nd amended complaint. (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 02/16/10. (ki)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: order 22 & pltf's proposed amended complaints 23 & 24 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Clrk of Ct to docket prop amended complaint 23 as amended complaint & transfer that complaint to USDC WDPA.; 2. Clrk of Ct to docket prop amended complaint 24 as amended complaint, adjust named defts on docket & fwd to USM for service on named defts. (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 09/10/09. (ki)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Pltf's motion for separation of parties 11 GRANTED in part & DENIED in part (see Paras 1a-1c for specifics).; 2. Clrk of Ct to fwd 2 copies of form civil rts complaint to pltf...; 3. Both forms to be filed as prop amended complaint w/ No. 1:07-CR-0790... pltf not permitted to attach any exhibits.; 4. Pltf to file prop amended complaints by 8/31/09.; 5. Defts' motion to dismiss 16 DENIED w/out prejudice as MOOT. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 08/03/09. (ki)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: USCA Mandate 9 - It is hereby ORDERED that the USM is directed to serve pltf's complaint 1 on defts named therein. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 01/15/09. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mincy v. Klem et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Klem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilton Karriem Mincy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?