Mieczkowski v. York City School District et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Mieczkowski
Defendant: York City School District, Deloris Penn and Tresa Diggs
Case Number: 1:2007cv01102
Filed: June 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the magistrate judge 55 , GRANTING defendants' motion for summary judgment 39 , directing Clrk of Ct to enter JUDGMENT in favor of defts & against pltf on all claims, & directing Clrk of Ct to CLOSE case. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 03/19/10. (ki)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by York City School District, Tresa Diggs, Deloris Penn - IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Defendants motion for summary judgment be granted. Objections to R&R due by 1/7/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on December 21, 2009. (kjn )
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting motion to reinstate 20 pltf's Title VII claim & directing defts to file, by 2/15/08, an answer to paras 40-42 of pltfs' complaint, which contain her Title VII allegations. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 02/01/08. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mieczkowski v. York City School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Mieczkowski
Represented By: Don Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York City School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloris Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tresa Diggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?