Johnson et al v. McMahon et al
Plaintiff: Jamiel Johnson, Dwayne Combs, Josh Griffin, Anthony Lee Gray, Demetrius Bailey, Richard Sutton, Demetrius Green, Devin Spady, Renard Gray, William Victor, Timothy Schofield and Haashiem Andrews
Defendant: Melissa McMahon, Jill Novell, K. Fisher, T. Gimbenski, David Wakefield, Dorina Varner, R. M. Lawler, M. W. Harlow, Jeffrey Beard, Lee Ann Mock, Charles Mitchell, Mary Showalter, Caleb Younker, Kevin Kauffman, Daniel Baird, Richard Hinkle, Donald Fortney, Angela Augman, Prison Health Services and Lt. Holtz
Case Number: 1:2007cv02238
Filed: December 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: AM
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Conditions)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), - IT IS ORDERED that the 208 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Hinkle, Donald Fortney is GRANTED as set forth in the order. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/28/16. (sc)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - Pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal entered into between the parties (Doc. No. 199), all claims set forth against Defendants Wakefield, Baird, Harlow, Kauffman, Lawler and Mock are w ithdrawn by Plaintiff and dismissed with prejudice from this action. Commonwealth Defendants motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 174) isgranted. Summary judgment is granted in favor of Defendants and againstPlaintiff on the following claims: all cl aims against Defendant Beard; due process and access-to-the-courts claims against Defendant Hinkle and Fortney; all claims against Defendant Mitchell and Varner; and all claims against Defendants McMahon, Gembinski and Showalter. Plaintiffs retaliati on claim against Defendants Hinkle and Fortney and his conditions of confinement claims remain in this action. Within twenty (20) days, Defendants may file a further dispositive motion with respect to these claims. The failure to do so will result in this matter being scheduled for a pre-trial conference and trial at the convenience of the Court. 202 200 203 174 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/10/14. (sc)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 174 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/10/14. (sc)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Dft Auman's 164 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Dft Auman is dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on March 29, 2013. (sc)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Pltf shall file his opposing brief to the 164 MOTION for Summary Judgment within 14 days. Brief in Opposition due by 9/26/2012. SEE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on Sept. 12, 2012. (sc)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1)Pltfs mtn for cnsl is DENIED w/o prejudice. 2)The Clerk of Court is directed to strike Pltf's proposed 2nd amdcmplt from record. 3)Pltf's mtn for court order is DENIED AS MOOT. 4)Dft Auman's m tn to dismiss the proposed amdcmplt is DENIED AS MOOT. 5)Pltfs mtn and suppl mtn for relief/sanctions/to compel disc are DENIED. 6)W/o 14 days, the Corrections Dfts shall provide to Pltf a copy of Grievance #197757 - SEE ORDER. 139 141 150 154 155 Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on April 12, 2012. (sc)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 71 Motion for Sanctions is DENIED as moot. The 80 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. Dfts shall provide responses to the outstanding discovery requests within 30 days from the date of this order. Pltf's [ 77] Motion to Compel Discovery is DENIED w/o prejudice. Pltf's 66 Motion to Compel Discovery is DENIED. Pltf's 52 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 58 Motion for Relief are DENIED w/o prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on Sept. 21, 2010. (sc)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Plaintiff's 49 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The 36 Motion to Dismiss filed by dfts PHS and Auman is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED w/ r espect to Dft PHS, and all clms set forth against PHS are dismissed in their entirety. The motion is DENIED w/ respect to the 8th Amendment in adequate medical care and retaliation clms set forth against dft Auman. Defendant Auman shall file an answer w/i 20 days. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on March 19, 2009. (sc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. McMahon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamiel Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Lee Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Spady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renard Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Victor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Schofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haashiem Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Novell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Gimbenski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorina Varner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. M. Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. W. Harlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Ann Mock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Showalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caleb Younker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Fortney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Augman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Holtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?