Zimmerman v. Behler et al
Plaintiff: Randy S. Zimmerman
Defendant: Allen E. Behler, Naomi Wyatt, Donna Hoskins-Helm, Sheridan Thompson-Clark, Debbie Loughman and Karen Mitchell
Case Number: 1:2008cv00538
Filed: March 24, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: defts' MSJ 29 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The MSJ 29 is GRANTED.; 2. Clrk of Ct directed to enter JUDGMENT in favor of defts & against pltf on all claims.; 3. Clrk of Ct directed to CLOSE case. (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/08/09. (ki)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER construing letter from pltf's cnsl 38 as motion for ext of time to file br in opp to MSJ 29 & GRANTING same - pltf's br in opp to MSJ 29 & responsive stmt of mat'l facts due by 2/3/2009. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 01/27/09. (ki)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying deft Sheridan Thompson-Clark's motion to dismiss 12 as MOOT & directing Clrk of Ct to drop Sheridan Thompson-Clark as party to action. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/02/08. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmerman v. Behler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy S. Zimmerman
Represented By: John M. Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen E. Behler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naomi Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Hoskins-Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheridan Thompson-Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Loughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?