Benjey v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Thomas Ray Benjey sued Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and On-Demand Publishing, LLC d/b/a BookSurge for copyright infringement. Plaintiff alleges that Amazon fulfilled some of its online orders for Plaintiff's book -- "Keep A-goin: The Life of Lone Star Dietz" -- by obtaining copies of the advance reading copies from BookSurge, who knew they were not authorized to print final copies.

Plaintiff: Thomas Ray Benjey
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc. and On-Demand Publishing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2008cv01068
Filed: June 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Copyright Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: William W. Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:504 Copyright Infringement
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2009 Filing 15 Letter from Deputy Clerk to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks advising of closing order. (pw, )
March 2, 2009 Filing 14 AND NOW, this 2nd day of March, 2009, it is ORDERED that the stipulation and order of settlement (doc. 13) filed in this matter is approved. Said stipulation and order are final and shall be binding upon the parties, their successors and their assigns.Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 3/2/09. (pw, )
February 24, 2009 Filing 13 First MOTION for Settlement by Thomas Ray Benjey. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - STANDARD CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK - AND NOW, this 1st day of Oct., 2008, in con. w/the CMC in this matter IT IS ORDERED THAT: a) Discovery due by 5/1/2009. b) Mtns. for joinder of parties shall be filed by 10/30/08. Mtns. to amd. pleadings shall be filed by 12/1/08. c) All p.t. mtns. due by 5/1/2009...d) This case shall be placed on the June, 2009 trial list of this crt., sched. order to follow. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 10/1/08. (am, )
September 24, 2008 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Thomas Ray Benjey. (Duncan, Jason)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2008 @ 9:00 AM before Honorable William W. Caldwell, in chambers, 9th Flr., Fed. Bldg., 3rd & Walnut Sts., Hbg., PA...Joint Case Mgmt. Plan must be filed @ least five days prior to the conf.(See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 8/29/08. (am, )
August 21, 2008 Filing 8 ATTACHMENT(S) Exhibit A by Thomas Ray Benjey re 1 Complaint, filed by Thomas Ray Benjey. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Thomas Ray Benjey.(Duncan, Jason)
August 15, 2008 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by On-Demand Publishing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.Com, Inc. for On-Demand Publishing, LLC. (Frey, Matthew)
August 15, 2008 Filing 6 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by On-Demand Publishing, LLC.(Frey, Matthew)
August 12, 2008 Document No. 4 has been deleted per request of counsel and has been correctly filed as Document No. 5. (dc)
August 11, 2008 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Frey, Matthew)
August 11, 2008 Filing 3 ANSWER to 1 Complaint , Certificate of Service by Amazon.Com, Inc..(Frey, Matthew)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures - to all counsel of record 1 . Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 6/6/08. (am, )
June 4, 2008 Summons Issued as to Amazon.Com, Inc., On-Demand Publishing, LLC and provided to Attorney for service on Defendant(s). (dfm)
June 3, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.Com, Inc., On-Demand Publishing, LLC ( Filing fee $350, Receipt Number 1303806), filed by Thomas Ray Benjey. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjey v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Ray Benjey
Represented By: Duane P. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On-Demand Publishing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?