Bush v. Lewisburg U.S.P. Federal Prison
Plaintiff: William E. Bush
Defendant: Lewisburg U.S.P. Federal Prison
Case Number: 1:2008cv01990
Filed: November 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Presiding Judge: EC
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM & ORDER - re: Dfts' motion to dismiss and for summary judgment 50 - It is hereby Ordered that: 1) Dfts' motion to dismiss is DENIED; 2) Dfts' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; 3) Clerk is directed to ENTER judgment i n favor of dfts and against pltf; 4) Clerk is directed to CLOSE case; and 5) Any appeal from this order is DEEMED frivolous...SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/22/10 (dc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2010: # 1 MAIN) (ki). Modified on 9/22/2010 to replace w/ corrected version of memo & order (ki).
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying plaintiff's motion for appt of counsel 55 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 01/22/10. (ki )
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Pltf's requests for appt of cnsl 8 , 12 , 13 , & 18 are DENIED...l; 2. Pltf to comply w/ ct's 2/27/09 order 17 directing pltf to file br in response to deft's motions... by 4/10/09.; 3. Failure to comply w/ this order may result in granting of the motions or dismissal of case for failure to prosecute... (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 03/20/09. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bush v. Lewisburg U.S.P. Federal Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewisburg U.S.P. Federal Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?