Simonton v. Tennis et al
Case Number: 1:2009cv00233
Filed: February 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Conditions) Office
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Presiding Judge: EC
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying pltf's motion to appoint counsel 69 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 04/05/11. (ki)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. MSJ 28 on behalf of defts Tennis, Thompson, Marsh, Bryan & Graham GRANTED.; 2. Clrk of Ct directed to enter jdmt in favor of said defts & against pltf.; 3. Clrk of Ct further directed to enter jd gmt in favor of defts Woodring, Rackovan & Williams per ct's 1/22/10 order 21 .; 4. Clrk of Ct to CLOSE case.; 5. Any appeals from this order deemed frivolous & not in good faith... (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 03/16/11. (ki)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER affording pltf final opportunity to file by 11/10/10 a stmt of mat'l facts responding to defts' stmt of mat'l facts. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/01/10. (ki)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying pltf's motion for appt of cnsl 47 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 09/14/10. (ki)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERD that: 1. Pltf's motion for ext of time 39 GRANTED to extent that he shall br response to motin in acc w/ LR 7/6 & response to defts' stmt of mat'l facts in acc w/ LR 56.1 by 8/20/10.; 2. No further exts wi ll be granted.; 3. Failure to comply w/ this order may result in motion being deemed unopposed or dismissal of case for failure to prosecute...; 4. Pltf's motion for appt of cnsl 38 DENIED...; 5. Pltf's motion to proceed IFP 40 DENIED... (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 07/01/10. (ki)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: Pltf's motion 33 & 34 GRANTED to ext that he shall file br in response to MSJ in acc w/ LR 7.6 & a response to defts' stmt of mat'l facts in acc w/ LR 56.1 by 7/16/2010.; 2. Failure to comply w/ this order may result in motion being deemed unopposed or dismissal of case for failure to prosecute... (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 06/02/10. (ki)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The motion for partial summ jdgmt 11 on pleadings on behalf of defts Rackovan, Williams, Watson & Woodring GRANTED.; 2. Entry of jdgmt DEFERRED pending final disposition of matter.; 3. Clrk of Ct to TERMINATE these defts. (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 01/22/10. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simonton v. Tennis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?