Evans v. York County Adult Probation and Parole Department et al
Plaintiff: Gary Phillip Evans
Defendant: York County Adult Probation and Parole Department and Donald R. Lauer, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01013
Filed: May 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING plaintiff's post-trial motion 80 . (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 09/17/12. (ki)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying deft Lauer's motion for reconsideration 57 of ct's 10/17/11 order 50 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/03/11. (ki)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying pltf's motion in limine 45 to exclude evid of substance of Evans' 2006 convictions... w/out prejudice to rts of Evans to object to evid Evans believes is improperly offered @ trial & directing that cnsl for parties shal l refrain from any mention of the specific details of the 2006 convictions in opening stmts or thereafter unless matter properly addressed @ side bar & ct deems such evid admissible @ that time. (See order for completed details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/17/11. (ki)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: report of the magistrate judge 36 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The report of the magistrate judge 36 is ADOPTED in part & REJECTED in part as follows: a. Rejected w/ re: conc that Lauer enjoys qualified immunity & that defts' MSJ should therefore be granted in full, b. ADOPTED in all other respects.; 2. Defts' MSJ 12 GRANTED in part & DENIED in part as follows: a. GRANTED in favor of the Department, b. DENIED in all other respects.; 3. Evans' moti on for partial summ jdgmt 20 is DENIED.; 4. Clrk of Ct directed to defer entry of jdgmt on claims described in Para 2(a) until resolution of all claims. (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/10/10. (ki)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 2 without prejudice. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 07/09/09. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. York County Adult Probation and Parole Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Phillip Evans
Represented By: Randall L. Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York County Adult Probation and Parole Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald R. Lauer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?