Knopick v. Connelly et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Knopick
Defendant: John J. Connelly, Jr., Susan M. Kadel, James, Smith, Durkin & Connelly, L.L.P. and Philip A. Downey
Case Number: 1:2009cv01287
Filed: July 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H. Rambo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MEMORANDUM re dft's MOTION to Bifurcate 144 (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 04/03/14. (ma)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MEMORANDUM re. MOTION to Continue 136 (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 01/23/14. (ma)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 132 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Nicholas Knopick. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 11/25/13. (pw)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint 119 Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 11/12/13. (ma)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) Dft Downeys mtn requesting this court certify its 8/5/13 order denying Dft Downeys mtn for judgment on the pleadings for an interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) 112 is DENIED. The ddls set forth in the most recent case management order 93 remain in effect.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/21/13. (ma)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM re Dft's mtns for judgment on the pleadings 94 and for reconsideration 96 (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 08/05/13. (ma)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Dft's 2nd Motion for Summary Judgment 49 Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 05/06/13 (ma)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting dft Downey's Motion for Summary Judgment 15 ; denying pltf's Motion for Leave to File supplemental brief 30 . Clerk to enter judgment and close the case.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 01/25/10 (ma, )
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the Motion to Dismiss 4 of Connelly, Jr., Kadel, James, Smith, Durkin and Connelly, LLPSigned by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 12/29/09 (ma, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knopick v. Connelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Knopick
Represented By: Dennis E. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Connelly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan M. Kadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James, Smith, Durkin & Connelly, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip A. Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?