Gaughen v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Gaughen
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2009cv02488
Filed: December 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying pltf's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 47 Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 01/31/12 (ma, )
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying government's motion to compel 40 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 03/31/11. (ki)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying plaintiff's motion for judgment on the pleadings 12 without prejudice & granting gov't leave to amend answer w/in 20 days of date of this order. (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 01/27/11. (ki)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting in part and denying in part the motion to compel 9 - a. GRANTED w/ re: interrog #2...; b. Gov't to provide pltf's cnsl w/ priv log indexing mat'ls considered to be privileged...; c. DENIED in all other respects w/out p rejudice to Gaughen's rt to file motion seeking similar relief after production & review of gov't's priv log.; 5. After prep of priv log parties to meet & confef & attempt to reach agreement re: discovery of allegedly privileged mat'ls. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 08/16/10. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaughen v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Gaughen
Represented By: Victor P. Stabile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?