Brown et al v. Trueblue, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Brown, Jr. and Matthew Jury
Defendant: Trueblue, Inc. and Labor Ready Northeast, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00514
Filed: March 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201 Violation of Fair Labor Act of 1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs proposed award of attorneys fees in the amount of $65,000.00 is APPROVED. (Doc. No. 114-2 2(c)). The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/5/13. (sc)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs motion for approval of its proposed settlement agreement (Doc. No. 111) is GRANTED with the exception of the confidentiality provision in Paragraph 10 (Doc. No. 114-2 10) and the award of at torneys fees in the amount of $65,000.00. 111 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, in accordance with the standard identified in thememorandum, Plaintiffs are directed to file any evidence supporting their proposed award of attorneys fees within twenty-one days of the date of this order. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on Sept. 24, 2013. (sc)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Pltf's 86 MOTION for Reconsideration is DENIED and this matter shall remain stayed pending arbitration. The parties are directed to file a joint status report no later than 6/29/2012 and every 60 days thereafter, apprising the Court of the status of this case. 85 Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on April 16, 2012. SEE MEMORANDUM FOR DETAILS. (sc)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 63 MOTION to Compel Arbitration is GRANTED and this action is STAYED pending arbitration. The parties are to file a joint status report by 1/31/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on Nov. 22, 2011. (sc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Trueblue, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Craig P. Kalinoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Jury
Represented By: Craig P. Kalinoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trueblue, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Labor Ready Northeast, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?