Bieber et al v. Nace et al
Plaintiff: Stephen K. Bieber and Karen Bieber
Defendant: David J. Nace and Eastern Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00718
Filed: April 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying Eastern Industries, Inc.'s motion for reimbursement of expenses & counsel fees pursuant to LR 30.12 73 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 04/04/12. (ki)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: MILs 75 , 77 , 79 & 88 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Deft Eastern's MIL 75 to preclude any ref to Eastern employes placing flags on temp road const signs s/p 6/2/08 accident GRANTED in part.. (see Paras 1a & 1b for specifics).; 2. Deft Eastern's MIL 77 to preclude portions of trial testimony of pltfs' expt Dr. Perez is DENIED.; 3. Deft Eastern's MIL 79 to preclude portions of trial testimony of pltfs' expt Dr. Camillo is DENIED.; 4. Pltfs' MIL 88 to preclude any ref by defts to PA Fair Share Act, risks inherent in motorcycling, &/or to proxmiate causation GRANTED in part & DENIED in part... (see Paras 4a-c for specifics). (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 03/06/12 (ki)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying deft Eastern's motion in limine 65 to preclude argument that employees of Eastern fled the scene or attempted to conceal their involvement in 6/2/08 accident w/out prejudice to Eastern's right to object to evidence or argument it believes is improperly offered @ trial. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 01/12/12. (ki)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying deft Eastern's motion in limine 38 to preclude report & testimony of Dr. Bell re: pltf's work life expectancy. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/15/11. (ki)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting pltf's motion in limine 26 , STRIKING 5th affirm defense of deft David J. Nace 8 , STRIKING 4th affirm defense in answer of deft Eastern Industries 11 , & noting that ERISA preempts PMVFRL from operating to bar or reduce recovery of med expenses by Biebers in instant action. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/13/11. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bieber et al v. Nace et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen K. Bieber
Represented By: Leslie N. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Bieber
Represented By: Leslie N. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Nace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?