Hagan v. Beard et al
Plaintiff: Damont Hagan
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard, Shirley Smeal, James Barnacle, David Novitsky, Dorina Varner, John Palakovich, Richards Southers, Robert Valociak, Ian Taggart, John Horner, Reading, Nathan Goss, Barry Jones, William Warner, Houser, K. Moore, Chris Chambers, Robert Eger, Mark Spieles, Brant, Andy Hubert, Phelps, Bankes and Alverez
Case Number: 1:2010cv00883
Filed: April 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND (Order to follow as separate docket entry) ORDER - AND NOW, this 31st day of January, 2014, for the reasons set forth in theaccompanying memorandum, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the plaintiffsMotion to Alter Judgment, (Doc. 215), is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on January 31, 2014. (kjn)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 147 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Hearsay filed by Brant, William Warner, Robert Eger, Chris Chambers, Barry Jones, Nathan Goss, Houser, Mark Spieles, Bankes, Andy Hubert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on May 30, 2013. (kjn)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the plaintiffs and defendants motions in limine (Docs. 145 and 155.) are GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part, as follows: 1. Defendants will be permitted to cross examine plaintiffs witnesses on the fact of their various prior convictions and the resulting imprisonment, without eliciting any further detail. 2. Defendants may testify to their knowledge that [Hagan] was convicted of crimes of violence and the length of his sentences, Womack v. Smith, 1:06-CV-2348, 2012 WL 1245752 (M.D. Pa. Apr. 13, 2012), but defendants may not describe the specific nature of those offenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on May 29, 2013. (kjn)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED as follows: 1. Plaintiffs motion in limine, excluding handwritten notes from the trial of this case (Doc. 153.), is GRANTED,. 2. Plaintiffs motion in limine which seeks to exclude extrinsic evidence of pri or institutional misconduct citations, (Doc. 154.) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED in part as follows: The defendants will not bepermitted to present extrinsic evidence of this misconduct citation, andwill not be permitted to cross examine the plaint iff regarding this matter,but defendants will be able to testify to their personal knowledgeregarding the plaintiffs prior institutional misconduct to the extent thatthese matters were known to the officers in August 2008 and informedtheir judgment regarding the quantum of force needed in this case.Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on May 15, 2013. (kjn)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER deeming defts' MSJ 126 as unopposed & GRANTING same, DEFERRING entry of jdgmt on these retaliation claims pending final resolution of matter, directing that excessive force claim against defts Spieles, Hubert, Jones, & Bankes & conspiracy claim against defts Warner, Chamber, Houser, Goss & Spieles will proceed to trial, & noting scheduling order will follow. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 1/29/13. (ki)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER denying defts' motion for ext of time 90 to file br & docs in opp to pltf's motion for prelim inj as MOOT, denying defts' motion 91 to reset pretrial ddls & pltf's motion 93 for ext of time to complete discovery as MOO T, granting deft' motion 106 for leave to file reply brief one day out of time (reply br 105 deemed timely), & denying pltf's motion for appt of cnsl 107 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 05/09/12. (ki)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying plaintiff's motion for prelim injunction 84 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 04/13/12. (ki)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying pltf's motion for reconsideration 69 of portion of court's 9/30/11 order (68). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/15/11. (ki)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. "Indifference" claim against deft Smeal in 2nd complaint... is voluntarily DISMISSED... & Clrk of Ct to TERMINATE said deft.; 2. Motion to dismiss 47 GRANTED in part & DENIED in part.; 3. Motion GRANTED as to following claims... (see memo & order for specifics) and Motion DENIED w/ re: following claims... (see memo & orde for specifics).; 4. Pltf's motion to disregard & reprimand 61 is DENIED.; 5. Defts shall file answer or appropriate pretrial motion by 10/31/11 addressing following remaining claims in 2nd amended complaint... (See Paras 5a-c for specifics). (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 09/30/11. (ki)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re: pltf's 2nd amended complaint 45 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Clrk of Ct to TERM defts Beard, Barnacle, Varner, Valociak, Taggart, Horner, Reading, Alvarez, Southers.; 2. Clrk of Ct to FWD 2nd amended complaint to cnsl for defts Sp ieles, Junes, Eger, Chambers, Smeal, Novisky, Palakovich, Goss, Jones, Warner, Moore, Hubert, Phelps, Bankes, Brant & Houser.; 3. Defts shall responde to 2nd amended complaint in acc w/ FRCP. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 02/09/11. (ki)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Defts' motion to dismiss 34 is GRANTED to extent that pltf will be directed to file 2nd amended complaint.; 2. Pltf's motion to amend 40 is GRANTED.; 3. Pltf's prop 2nd amended complaint 43 R EJECTED.; 4. Clrk of Ct to fwd civil rts form complaint to pltf.; 5. Pltf to file 2nd amended complaint using enc form by 2/15/11...; 6. 2nd amended complaint shall contain same case number already assigned to this action...; 7. Pltf strictly caution ed that inc of separate, unrelated claims will be considered a failuret to comply w/ order of court & will result in rejection of 2nd amended complaint.; 8. Failure to file 2nd amended complaint w/in spec time period will result in matter proceeding on amended complaint & ct considering defts' arguments to dismiss same... (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 01/26/11. (ki)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting pltf's motion to amend complaint 25 until 11/15/10 & dismissing defts' motion 20 to dismiss pltf's complaint as MOOT. (See order for complet details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/01/10. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagan v. Beard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damont Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Smeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Barnacle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Novitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorina Varner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Palakovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richards Southers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Valociak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Taggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reading
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Eger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Spieles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Hubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alverez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?