Atwell v. SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Atwell
Defendant: SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv01271
Filed: June 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING deft's motion to dismiss 49 , DISMISSING all claims filed by pltf against deft with prejudice, DENYING deft's MSJ 26 as MOOT, & directing Clrk of Ct to CLOSE case. (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 01/26/12. (ki)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: ct's 6/6/11 order 39 & objections thereto filed by cnsl for pltf - It is hereby ORDERED that Atwell & his cnsl are equally liable to SPX for costs in the amt of $1,629.69 & fees in the amt of $12,268. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/11/11. (ki )
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re: affidavits of costs & fees 41 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. By 7/22/11 SPX shall submit to ct & cnsl for Atwell the billing memo in matter as well as affidavit re: experience & background of attys who provided legal svcs for claimed cos ts & fees.; 2. SPX may redact any priv info contained in billing memo & submit priv log describing priv asserted.; 3. Should SPX submt redacted version of billing memo SPX shall also file under seal w/ ct an unredacted version.; 4. By 7/29/11 cnsl for pltf may submit supp'l objs to costs & fees asserted by SPX. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 07/13/11. (ki)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART the motion for costs, fees & sanctions 24 by deft SPX. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 06/06/11. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atwell v. SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Atwell
Represented By: Wayne A. Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?