Kliss v. East Hanover Township et al Featured Case

A Pennsylvania resident sued his local government after they forced him to remove the word 'crap' from a sign protesting fees associated with a local sewage project.

Plaintiff: David Kliss
Defendant: East Hanover Township and Light-Heigel & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv01945
Filed: September 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2010 Filing 10 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by East Hanover Township.(Young, James)
September 27, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Thomas Wyland on behalf of East Hanover Township (Wyland, Scott)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER re: pltf's motion 2 for prelim injunction - Hearing on motion set for 9/28/2010 @ 01:30 PM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 2 before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 09/22/10. (ki)
September 22, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J. Lavery, Jr on behalf of East Hanover Township (Lavery, Frank)
September 22, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Young on behalf of East Hanover Township (Young, James)
September 21, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Underhill on behalf of Light-Heigel & Associates, Inc. (Underhill, Christopher)
September 17, 2010 SUMMONS ISSUED as to East Hanover Township and Light-Heigel & Associates, Inc. and provided to Attorney for service on Defendants. (pjr)
September 16, 2010 Filing 4 DECLARATION filed by David Kliss. (pjr)
September 16, 2010 Filing 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by David Kliss.(pjr)
September 16, 2010 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by David Kliss.(pjr)
September 16, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - n/c to counsel, jury trial demanded ( Filing fee $350, Receipt Number 1983163) filed by David Kliss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(pjr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2010: # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (pjr, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kliss v. East Hanover Township et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kliss
Represented By: Aaron D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Hanover Township
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Light-Heigel & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?