e-LYNXX Corporation v. InnerWorkings, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: e-LYNXX Corporation
Defendant: Taylor Corporation, Rent-A-Center, Inc., Dr. Pepper Snapple Group, Inc., R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company, NewlineNoosh, Inc., The Standard Register Company, Quadrem U.S., Inc., Emptoris, Inc., PrintVision, Inc., Cirqit.Com, Inc., Williams Lea, Inc., InnerWorkings, Inc. and Staples, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv02535
Filed: December 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER (Memorandum 319 filed previously as separate docket entry) DENYING motion to alter or amend judgment 308 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/6/14. (ki)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 302 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Defts' motion for leave to file amended answer 252 is DENIED.; 2. e-Lynxx's motion to strike Cirquit's summ jdgmt evidence 259 is DENIED.; 3. e-Lynxx's request for oral argu ment 299 is DENIED.; 4. InnerWorkings' MSJ 235 is GRANTED.; 5. Cirqit's MSJ 232 id GRANTED.; 6. InnerWorkings' motion to exclude testimony of e-Lynxx's damages expert Clifford Fry, Ph.D. 295 is DENIED as MOOT.; 7. Clrk of Ct directed to CLOSE case. (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/25/13. (ki)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER re: stipulation of dismissal 221 - It is hereby ORDERED that all claims btwn e-Lynxx & Rent-a-Center are dismissed w/out prejudice w/ each party to bear its own attys' fees, costs & expenses. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/03/12. (ki)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying defts' motion for summary judgment 109 & construing disputed claim terms as follows... (see Paras 2a-l for specifics). (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 09/27/12. (ki)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER approving e-Lynxx & Taylor Corp's stipulation of dismissal 189 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 03/08/12. (ki)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge Methvin 93 , DENYING defts' motion to dismiss 54 as to pltf's direct-infringement claims & GRANTED as to pltf's indirect-infringement claims, & GRANTING plaintiff leave to amend complaint. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 08/16/11. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: e-LYNXX Corporation v. InnerWorkings, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: e-LYNXX Corporation
Represented By: Thomas J. Finucane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rent-A-Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Pepper Snapple Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewlineNoosh, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Standard Register Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quadrem U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emptoris, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PrintVision, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cirqit.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Lea, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InnerWorkings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staples, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?