Ferguson v. Sniezek et al
Plaintiff: John Ferguson
Defendant: T. R. Sniezek, Russell C. Hendershot, Kim Ask-Carlson, Eileen Falzini, Patrick Burns, Kevin Christeleit, Joseph Rush, David N. Steffan, Brigida Zabala and Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 1:2010cv02638
Filed: December 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Schuylkill
Presiding Judge: AM
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H. Rambo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM re MOTION for Relief from Judgment 102 filed by John Ferguson (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/7/15. (ma)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM re MOTION to Substitute Party 78 (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 06/26/14. (ma)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: 1) Dfts Hendershot, Falzini, Burns, and Zabala are DISMISSED as parties in this action. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(1).2) The mtn for summary judgment 20 is GRANTED.3) The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER judgment in favor of Dfts Sniezek, Ask-Carlson, Christeleit, Rush, Steffan, and Federal Bureau of Prisons and against Pltf.4) The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 07/30/13. (ma)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1) The 49 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. 2) Plaintiff shall file a brief in opposition to the pending motion to dismiss and for summary judgment, on or before 1/30/12. No further extensions of time will be granted by the court absent extraordinary circumstances.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 12/29/11. (pjr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Sniezek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ferguson
Represented By: Larrick Stapleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. R. Sniezek
Represented By: Timothy Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell C. Hendershot
Represented By: Timothy Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Ask-Carlson
Represented By: Timothy Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen Falzini
Represented By: Timothy Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Burns
Represented By: Timothy Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Christeleit
Represented By: Timothy Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Rush
Represented By: Timothy Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David N. Steffan
Represented By: Timothy Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigida Zabala
Represented By: Timothy Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Timothy Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?