Landor v. Bledsoe et al
Plaintiff: Damon Landor
Defendant: B.A. Bledsoe, B Trate and Hepner
Case Number: 1:2011cv00759
Filed: April 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: William W. Caldwell
Presiding Judge: Martin C. Carlson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - AND NOW, this 16th day of January, 2013, upon consideration of the Report and Recommendation (R&R) of Magistrate Judge Carlson 99 , to which no objections have been filed, and upon independent review of th e record, the court finds no error in the R&R and concludes that the R&R should be adopted. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that:1. The R&R 99 is ADOPTED. 2. Defendant Hepners motion for summary judgment 76 is GRANTED. 3. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. 4. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. 99 76 Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 1/16/13. (am)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OPINION - Accordingly, for the foregoing reasons, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs motion for a continuance in order to hire an attorney (Doc. 67 ) and motion to be heard (Doc. 69 ) are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on May 25, 2012. (kjn)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson - AND NOW, this 17th day of May, 2012, upon con. of the R&R of the mag. judge 65 66 are adopted. 2. Plf.'s mtn. for a prel. injunc. 61 is DENIED. 3. Defts.'s mtn. to dismiss, or in the alternative, for SJ 33 , is GRANTED. 4. The claims against defts. Bledsoe & Trate are dism'd. w/prejudice. 5. The claims against deft. Hepner are dism'd. w/out prejudice. 6. Plf. may amen d his complt. as to deft. Hepner w/in 20 days of the dt. of this order. 7. The above-capt. case is remanded to the mag. judge for further proceedings, including a R&R on dispositive mtns., if necessary. (See order) B Trate, B.A. Bledsoe and Hepner terminated.Signed by Honorable William W. Caldwell on 5/17/12. (am, )
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Plaintiff's second request to appoint counsel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on 12/16/11. (rc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landor v. Bledsoe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.A. Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Trate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hepner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Landor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?