Billups et al v. Penn State Milton S. Hershey Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Jamel Billups, Jacqueline Rosario, T.R. and L.B.
Defendant: Penn State Milton S. Hershey Medical Center, Mark S. Dias, M.D., Kathryn R. Crowell, M.D., Arabinda K. Choudhary, M.D., Franklin County, Franklin County Office of Children, Youth and Families, Tammie Lay, Dawn M. Watson, Kari Coccagna, Minnie Tuner, Matthew Fogel, Lauren Sulcove, Borough of Chambersburg, William C. Frisby, Jr. and Kathleen D. Eggli, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2011cv01784
Filed: September 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation 241 of Magistrate Judge Saporito;2. Plaintiffs objections to the Report and Recommendation are OVERRULED; 3. Defendants motions 218 & 203 for summary judgment are GRANTED; 4. Plaintiffs motions 206 & 225 for summary judgment are DENIED; 5. Plaintiffs motion 244 to file exhibit under seal is DEEMED WITHDRAWN for failure to comply with Local Rule 7.5; 6. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs with respect to all remaining claims of the amended complaint; and 7. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/29/17. (rw)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 182 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Jacqueline Rosario, T.R., L.B., Jamel Billups re: 190 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 12/3/15. (ms)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)disposing of Plaintiff's Doc. 112 Motion to Compel Defendant's Discovery Responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Blewitt on 4/2/14. (ms)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM re: Plaintiffs' Doc. 91 Motion to Compel Hershey Defendants to Produce Documents. (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Blewitt on 8/7/13. (ms)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM and ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 1) the 60 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with respect to Counts I-B, II-A, II-B, II-C, VII and the substantive due process claim raised in Count I-A based on the Medical Center Dfts' failure to c onduct further medical examinations of L.B.; 2. The motion is DENIED with respect to the substantive due process claim raisedin Count I-A based on the misrepresentations allegedly made by Drs. Choudhary,Crowell, and Dias; and 3. The Clerk of Court is directed to TERMINATE Defendants Penn State Milton S.Hershey Medical Center and Dr. Kathleen Eggli, M.D., from this action. 61 Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on Nov. 20, 2012. (sc)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that PSMSH Med Center Dfts' 39 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, the Chambersburg Borough Dfts' 32 Motion to Dismiss GRANTED, and the Franklin Cty Dfts' 25 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as noted in the order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Pltfs are granted leave to file an amdcmp within 20 days. Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on April 23, 2012. SEE MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR DETAILS. (sc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billups et al v. Penn State Milton S. Hershey Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamel Billups
Represented By: Mark D. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Rosario
Represented By: Mark D. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.R.
Represented By: Mark D. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.B.
Represented By: Mark D. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penn State Milton S. Hershey Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Dias, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn R. Crowell, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arabinda K. Choudhary, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County
Represented By: David L. Schwalm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County Office of Children, Youth and Families
Represented By: David L. Schwalm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammie Lay
Represented By: David L. Schwalm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn M. Watson
Represented By: David L. Schwalm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kari Coccagna
Represented By: David L. Schwalm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnie Tuner
Represented By: David L. Schwalm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Fogel
Represented By: David L. Schwalm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Sulcove
Represented By: David L. Schwalm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borough of Chambersburg
Represented By: Eileen C. Finucane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C. Frisby, Jr.
Represented By: Eileen C. Finucane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen D. Eggli, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?