Ball v. Cooper et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Ball
Defendant: Beckley, S. Kerns Barr, Baker and Sgt. Cooper
Case Number: 1:2011cv01833
Filed: October 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Lycoming
Presiding Judge: Martin C. Carlson
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM ORDER - We will DENY these objections which we construe as motions to reconsider. Ball is directed to continue to comply with the filing deadlines previously set by this Court and IT IS ORDERED that any requests for continuance or stay mus t be made individually by Ball in each of her cases along with factual averments specific to each particular case identifying the deadline she wishes to extend or stay, and explaining why a stay or continuance is necessary.Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on 07/10/12. (pjr)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is ADOPTED, Dfts 58 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, and Pltf's complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THE CASE. 72 Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on June 25, 2012. (sc)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying 74 Motion to Stay - IT IS ORDERED that any requests for continuance or stay must be made individually by Ball in each of her cases along with factual averments specific to each particular case identifying the deadline she wishes to extend or stay, and explaining why a stay or continuance is necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on 06/20/12. (pjr)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the R&R is ADOPTED and Dft's 19 Motion is DENIED. Pltf is placed on notice that if any of her pending suits are dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which releif may be granted that such a dismissal would constitute a 'third strike'. This matter shall be referred back to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson. 47 Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on March 15, 2012. (sc)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - for the foregoing reasons, the following discovery motions filed by the plaintiff, Dawn Ball in violation of this Courts prior stay orders; namely Balls Motions to Take Inmate Declarations; Motions for Examination by Ou tside Specialists; Motions to Test Mold Samples; and Motions to Order SCI Muncy to Release Records are DENIED, without prejudice to the parties pursuing appropriate discovery once the pending, and potentially dispositive, motions to revoke in forma p auperis status are resolved. It is further ORDERED that The plaintiffs motions for Stays of Briefing of the Motions to Revoke Balls In Forma Pauperis status are DENIED with prejudice. Finally Ball is advised that further failures to comply with the Court orders may result in dismissal of these actions pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on January 6, 2012. (kjn )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ball v. Cooper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Kerns Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?