Miller v. Berdanier et al
Plaintiff: Edward Miller
Defendant: Wilson, Ashley Mroczka and Eugene Berdanier
Case Number: 1:2012cv00520
Filed: March 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Schuylkill
Presiding Judge: AM
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H. Rambo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER re: pltf's death - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Pro se pltf's motion 61 for disclosure of med recs & MSJ 90 DENIED as MOOT.; 2. Defts' MTDs 62 , 65 , & 78 DENIED as MOOT.;l 3. Matter DISMISSED pursuant to FRCP 25(a)(1).; 4. Clrk of Ct directed to CLOSE case. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/9/14. (ki)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that defts shall file stmt of suggestion of death in compliance w/ Rule 25 of FRCP w/in 10 days of date of this order. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/6/14. (ki)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying pltf's motion for leave to file 2nd amended complaint 74 . (See order for complete details.)Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/31/13. (ki)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction 71 . (See order for complete details.)Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/22/13. (ki)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Motion for ext of time to file amended complaint nunc pro tunc 48 GRANTED w/ pltf directed to file amended compalint utilizing enc civil rts form by 2/13/13...; 2. Should pltf fail to timely file amended compla int ct will consider a MTD action for failure to prosecute or a renewed MTD orig complaint if filed by defts.; 3. Motion for reconsideration of appt of cnsl 47 DENIED. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 1/15/13. (ki)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting motion 38 to strike amdended complaint 36 , striking amended complaint 36 , directing pltf to file amended complaint usijng enc civil rts form by 9/6/12..., & directing that failure to timely file amended complaint will result in dismissal of action. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 08/23/12. (ki)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER dismissing pltf's motion for summary judgment 29 as MOOT. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 07/03/12. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Berdanier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Mroczka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Berdanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?