Stemrich et al v. Zabiyaka et al
Plaintiff: James Stemrich and Danielle Stemrich
Defendant: T.L. Transport, LLC. and Oleh Zabiyaka
Case Number: 1:2012cv01409
Filed: July 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H. Rambo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 58 MOTION to Bifurcate w/ certificates filed by James Stemrich, Danielle Stemrich, 61 MOTION in Limine To Bifurcate Liability and Damages filed by T.L. Transport, LLC., Oleh Zabiyaka. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 3/10/14. (pw)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM re dfts' MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment 51 (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 02/21/14. (ma)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), Dfts motion to compel 42 is GRANTED IN PART.Pltfs shall provide a computation of damages, in accordance with FRCP 26(a)(1)(A)(iii) and the accompanying memorandum of law, within (10) days from the date of this order.If Dfts remain unsatisfied with Pltfs disclosures, they may file a renewed motion to compel. No further relief is granted at this time.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 08/13/13. (ma)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER - In accordance with the accompanying memorandum of law, IT ISHEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for leave to file an amendedcomplaint containing a claim for punitive damages 29 is GRANTED. Theproposed amended complaint (Doc. 29-6) is accepted for filing. (See memo for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 7/2/13. (am)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM re MOTION for Protective Order 19 for depositions of (Defendants) Oleh Zabiyaka and TL Transport, LLC filed by T.L. Transport, LLC., Oleh Zabiyaka Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 03/18/13. (ma)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stemrich et al v. Zabiyaka et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.L. Transport, LLC.
Represented By: Timothy J. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oleh Zabiyaka
Represented By: Timothy J. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Stemrich
Represented By: Michael A. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Stemrich
Represented By: Michael A. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?