Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Pennsylvania Game Commission v. Thomas E. Proctor Heirs Trust
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Pennsylvania Game Commission
Defendant: Thomas E. Proctor Heirs Trust
Case Number: 1:2012cv01567
Filed: August 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). Judge Schwab's report 155 is ADOPTED only to the extent set forth in the accompanying memorandum. The Game Commission's motion 123 for partial summary judgment is DENI ED. The Proctor Trusts' motion 94 for partial summary judgment is DENIED. The Proctor Trusts' motion 136 to strike declaration of J.C. Wilkinson, III, is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as more fully set forth in Judge Schwab's report 155 and our accompanying memorandum. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/21/2020. (ktt)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER (Memorandum 165 filed previously as separate docket entry) ADOPTING Judge Schwabs report 155 to extent set forth in memo 165 , GRANTING pltfs motion 123 for partial summary jdgmt, DENYING defts motion 94 for partial summary jdgmt, DEFE RRING entry of jdgmt per para 2 pending resolution of remaining claims sub judice, GRANTING in Part & DENYING in Part defts motion 136 to strike declaration of JC Wilkinson, III, as set forth more fully in Judge Schwabs report & this cts memo, & SC HEDULING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE to discuss status of remaining claims for 11:00 a.m. on 1/8/20 w/ counsel for pltf to initiate the call to chambers at (717)221-3941. (See order for complete details.).Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/18/19. (ki)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: 1. The report 77 of Chief M.J. Schwab is ADOPTED in its entirety.2. Pltfs mtn 67 to dismiss dfts counterclaim or, in the alternative, for a more definite statement or to strike certain paragraphs of said pleading is DENIED.3. The above-captioned matter is REMANDED to Chief M.J. Schwab for further pretrial management. Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/26/17. (ma)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT of Magistrate Judge Schwab 24 in its entirety, GRANTING deft's motion to dismiss 14 to extent it seeks dismissal of pltf's claim to quiet title pursuant to PaRCP 1061(b)(2), DISMissing pltf's claim pursuant to PaRCP 1061(b)(2) with prejudice, motion 14 DENIED in all other respects, & REMANDING case to Magistrate Judge Schwab for pretrial management. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 7/24/14. (ki)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge Schwab 11 , granting deft's MTD 6 , DISMISSING pltf's complaint 1 w/out prejudice & directing deft to respond to amended complaint 12 pursuant to Local Rules. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/18/2013. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Pennsylvania Game Commission v. Thomas E. Proctor Heirs Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Pennsylvania Game Commission
Represented By: Bradley C. Bechtel
Represented By: Audrey J. Broucek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Proctor Heirs Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?