Corbeil v. Cahill et al
Plaintiff: Clinton Matthew Corbeil
Defendant: Vincent Cahill, III, Angelo J. Jordan, Jeremy Watcher and Matthew Kaskie
Case Number: 1:2013cv01323
Filed: May 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Outside State
Presiding Judge: EC
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting deft's MTD 87 , dismissing complaint w/ prejudice & w/ no award of costs or attys' fees, & directing Clrk of Ct to CLOSE case. ( See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/15/16. (ki)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER (Memorandum 72 filed previously as separate docket entry) GRANTING defts' motion 46 to the extent that pltf's 14th Amendment due process claims are DISMISSED in their entirety & noting separate order setting forth pretrial schedule applicable to remaining 1st Amendment retaliation claim will issue. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/21/15. (ki)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER (Memorandum 44 filed previously as separate docket entry) DENYING defts' motion to dismiss &/or for summary judgment 19 & directing defts to file answer or appropriate pretrial motion by 4/15/14. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/25/14. (ki)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel 10 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/9/13. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corbeil v. Cahill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Matthew Corbeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Cahill, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelo J. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Watcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Kaskie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?