James v. Varano et al
Plaintiff: Paris L. James
Defendant: David Varano, Kathryn McCarty, Lori Alderman, Brian Davis, Jennifer Daya, Jane Doe #1, John Doe #10, Masser, Krzowski, Baker, Schooch, Rodriguez, Broughs, Novalis, Kratz, Elsee, Thomas Mosier, Keith Tripp, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7, John Doe #8, John Doe #9, John Doe #11 and John Doe #12
Case Number: 1:2014cv01951
Filed: October 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Northumberland
Presiding Judge: CP
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry 171 ) - AND NOW, on this 21st day of January 2020, in accordance with the Memorandum issued concurrently with this Order, IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. The Correctional Defendants renewed motion f or summary judgment (Doc. No. 160) is GRANTED;2. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of the Correctional Defendants (Defendants Mains, Schmerfeld, Alleman, Romedy, Segedy, Masser, Baker, Schoch, Krzykowski, Rodriguez, Burrows, N ovailis, Kratz, Hyde, Goodwin, Mosier, Tripp, and Else) and against Plaintiff Paris L. James as to the remaining excessive force claims raised in Jamess amended complaint (Doc. No. 28); and 3. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the above-captioned case. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/21/20. (dmn)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 151) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and 2. Defendants Mains, Schmerfeld, Romig, Segedy, Baker, Schoch, and Masser may file, within forty-five (45) days of the date of this Order, a renewed motion for summary judgment addressing Jamess Eighth Amendment excessive force claim. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/15/2019. (ve)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 JUDGMENT - Summary Judgment be & is hereby ENTERED in favor of defts Alderman, Baker, Broughs, Elsee, Goodwin, Hyde, Kratz, Krzowski, Masser, McCarty, Mosier, Novalis, Rodriguez, Romig, Schooch, Segedy, Tripp, Kulenguskey & Varano, & against pltf Pa ris L. James w/ re: pltf's 8th Amend deliberate indifference to a serious medical need claim & in favor of defts Kulenguskey & Krzykowski as to all claims, in acc w/ ct's memo & order 139 140 dated 3/23/18. (See jdgmt for complete details.)Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/23/18. (ki)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - Plaintiffs motion 80 to compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: a. Plaintiffs motion to compel is GRANTED only insofar as Defendants Davis and Daya shall fully respond to Plaintiffs first set of interrogatories numbers 11, 15, 16, and 22, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order;b. Plaintiffs motion to compel Defendants Davis and Daya to respond to Plaintiffs first set of interrogatories numbers 1 through 10, 12 through 14, 17 through 21, 23, 24, and 25, is DENIED; c. Plaintiffs motion to compel Defendant Daya to respond to the requests for admission is DENIED AS MOOT;d. Plaintiffs motion to compel Defendant Daya's responses to Plaintiffs second set of interrogatories is DENIED; and 2. The discovery and dispositive motion deadlines set forth in the Courts March 8, 2017 Order are modified to reflect that all remaining discovery shall be completed within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, and that any dispositive motion shall be filed within thirty (30) days of the close of discovery. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 6/14/17. (rw)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - AND NOW, this 8th day of March 2017, in accordance with the accompanying memorandum, IT IS ORDERED THAT:1. Plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction 49 is DENIED; 2. Plaintiffs m otion to amend the amended complaint to identify some of the John Doe Defendants 71 is GRANTED; 3. The United States Marshal is directed to serve the Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 28), this order and the accompanying memorandum on defendants Rod Romig, Scott Sagedy, Matt Hyde and Paul Goodwin at SCI-Coal Township; 4. Plaintiffs motion to compel discovery 72 is GRANTED as set forth below. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/8/17. (dmn)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/7/17. (rw)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Medical Defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. 30) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. 3. The Corrections Defendants motion to dismiss (Doc.31) is GRANT ED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. 10. All discovery shall be completed within ninety (90)days of the date of this order. 11.Any further dispositive motions shall be filed within thirty (30) days of the close of discovery. 12.James is granted 90 days from the date of this order in which to properly identify the John and Jane Doe defendants. 30 31 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/31/16. SEE ORDER. (sc)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER -IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Jamess motion for extension of time (Doc. 27) is GRANTED. 2. The Corrections Defendants motion to dismiss(Doc. 18) is DENIED AS MOOT. 3. The Medical Defendants motion to dismiss (Doc.20) is DENIED AS MOOT. 4. The original complaint is STRICKEN from the record.5. The Corrections Defendants and Medical Defendants may file with respect to the amended complaint (Doc. 28) a responsive pleading or dispositive motion within twenty (20) days of the date hereof. 20 27 18 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/25/15. (sc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Varano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paris L. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Varano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Alderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Daya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krzowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schooch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Mosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?