Gresh v. Huntingdon County et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Gresh
Defendant: Huntingdon County, Huntingdon County Sheriff's Office, Huntingdon County Agricultural Association, Inc., Bartlebaugh Amusements, Inc., Willaim G. Walters, Mark Foor, Jeff Leonard, Dan McCartney, Tammy S. Foor and Larry Cressman
Case Number: 1:2015cv01466
Filed: July 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Huntingdon
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER & JUDGMENT (Memorandum 94 filed previously as separate docket entry) GRANTING defts' MSJ 87 , JUDGMENT ENTERED in favor of defts Sheriff William G. Walters, Chief Deputy Mark Foor, Sergeant Jeff Leonard, Deputy Dan McCartney, Deputy Tam my S. Foor & Deputy Larry Cressman & against pltf Dennis Gresh on all remaining counts of the amended complaint 40 , & directing Clrk of Ct to CLOSE case. (See order & jdgmt for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 8/9/17. (ki)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying pltf's 2nd motion to appt cnsl 79 as MOOT. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/19/17. (ki)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER conditionally granting pro se pltf's motion for appt of cnsl 73 , directing Clrk of Ct to fwd case docs to pro bono chair of MDPA Chapter of FBA, directing pro bono chair to w/in 60 day notify ct in writing whether volunteer atty will enter appearance on behalf of pltf, & noting nothing in this order alters, etc., pretrial case mgmt ddls establihed by separate order of today's date. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/6/17. (ki)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM re Dfts' Mtns to Dismiss 14 , 43 , 45 and 47 (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/4/16. (ma)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER (Memorandum 38 filed previously as separate docket entry) - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Huntingdon Co defts' MTD 14 is GRANTED in Part... (see Paras 1a-e for specifics) & 2. DENIED w/ re: pltf's 4th Amend claim w/ re: indiv Hunt ingdon Co deft & w/ re: pltf's state law claims for assault, battery & false imprisonment.; 3. Ag Assoc's MTD 23 is GRANTED - pltf's Section 1983 conspiracy claim against Ag Assoc DISMISSED w/out prejudice.; 4. Bartelbaugh's MTD 33 GRANTED - pltf's Section 1983 claim against Bartlebaugh DISMISSED w/out prejudice.; 5. Deft Huntingdon Co Sheriff's Office DISMISSED w/ prejudice...; 6. Pltf granted leave to amend pleading w/in 20 days of date of this order.... in absence of timely filed amended complaint case shall proceed on remaining claims. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/24/16. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gresh v. Huntingdon County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Gresh
Represented By: Joseph F. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntingdon County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntingdon County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntingdon County Agricultural Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bartlebaugh Amusements, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willaim G. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Foor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan McCartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy S. Foor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Cressman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?