BASILE v. STREAM ENERGY PENNSYLVANIA, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Steven Basile
Defendant: Stream Energy Pennsylvania, LLC and Stream Energy
Case Number: 1:2015cv01518
Filed: August 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #86 Motion for Attorney Fees. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/28/18 (ve)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Settlement. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/28/18 (ve)
September 7, 2018 Filing 95 BRIEF in Support re #94 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Final Approval , filed by Steven Basile. Related document: #94 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Final Approval filed by Steven Basile. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick James, #2 Declaration of Austin Schwing, #3 Exhibit(s) Unreported Opinions, #4 Proposed Order)(Shub, Jonathan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 94 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Final Approval by Steven Basile.(Shub, Jonathan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 93 DECLARATION by Steven Basile Of Settlement Administrator. (Shub, Jonathan)
September 4, 2018 Filing 92 NOTICE of Change of Address by Troy M. Frederick (Frederick, Troy)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #89 Motion for Leave to File. See order for complete details. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/31/18 (ve)
August 31, 2018 Filing 90 Proposed Pretrial Order to Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of 5,000 Words by Steven Basile. (Shub, Jonathan)
August 30, 2018 Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Excess of 5,000 Words by Steven Basile.(Shub, Jonathan)
July 31, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 87 deleted and refiled as Doc. 88. (pjr)
July 31, 2018 Filing 88 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #86 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Service Award, Appointment of Class Counsel, filed by Steven Basile. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Shub, Jonathan)
July 31, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile Doc. 87 using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)-Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). (pjr)
July 31, 2018 Filing 86 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Service Award, Appointment of Class Counsel, by Steven Basile. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shub, Jonathan)
July 31, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Docs 86, 87 & 88 deleted. Counsel will refile. (dmn)
June 6, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jonathan Shub (Shub, Jonathan)
May 31, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Final Fairness Hearing to be Held 9/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 4 before Honorable Yvette Kane. (rw)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry): IT IS ORDERED THAT Plaintiff Steven Basiles Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Doc. No. 80), is GRANTED as follows: 1. The Court preliminarily approves the proposed Settlement Agreement #81 , subject to further consideration at the Final Fairness Hearing referenced below. The Settlement Agreement calls for Defendants to provide benefits to Class Members who submit valid claims as follows: a. A Class Member who was on Defendants Variable Rate Electricity Plan at any point between June 1, 2011 and February 29, 2015 (Time Period 1), will receive payment in the amount of 5% of all amounts he or she paid to Defendants for services provided under the Variable Rate Electricity Plan during Time Period 1. b. A Class Member who was on Defendants Variable Rate Electricity Plan at any point between March 1, 2015 and the date of preliminary approval (Time Period 2), will receive payment in the amount of 2% of all amounts he or she paid to Defendants for services provided under the Variable Rate Electricity Plan during Time Period 2...2. The Court preliminary finds that the proposed Settlement Class (Doc. No. 81-1 at 8-9), meets the requirements of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 23(a) and 23(b)(3), and conditionally certifies the Settlement Class for settlement purposes. a. The preliminary Settlement Class consists of: all persons in the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania who were enrolled as a customer of Defendants and were on Defendants Variable Rate Electricity Plan at any time during the Class Period (i.e., June 1, 2011 through the preliminary approval date)... b. Excluded from the Settlement Class are: Defendants, any entities in which Defendants have a controlling interest, and any of their parents, subsidiaries, affiliates, officers, and directors; the presiding judge(s) in this case and her(their) immediate family; and any person who has previously released claims against Defendants, including but not limited to persons who released claims against Defendants pursuant to the settlement of a complaint submitted to the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission. The Settlement Class also excludes all persons who timely elect to exclude themselves from the Settlement Class and follow the procedure set forth in this Order. 3. The Court preliminarily finds that Steven Basile has and will fairly and adequately represent and protect the interests of the absent members of the Settlement Class in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23.4. The Court appoints Jonathan Shub, Esq., of Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C. and Troy M. Frederick, Esq. of Marcus & Mack, P.C. as Interim Counsel. 5. If the Settlement Agreement is terminated or not consummated for any reason, the certification of the Settlement Class shall be void, and Plaintiff and Defendants shall be deemed to have reserved all their rights to propose or oppose all certification issues. 6. The Court preliminarily approves the settlement benefits as described in the Settlement Agreement. Defendants will also pay the costs of notice and administration, and any attorneys fees, litigation expenses, and service award approved by the Court, under the terms, conditions, and limitations specified in the Settlement Agreement... 8. The Court appoints Angeion Group, LLC, as the Settlement Administrator... Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/31/18. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.(rw) (Main Document 84 replaced on 5/31/2018) (rw).
May 31, 2018 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry), RE: Unopposed Motion #80 for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/31/18. (rw)
May 9, 2018 Filing 82 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel and Defendant's Counsel (Jointly) . (Shub, Jonathan)
January 2, 2018 Filing 81 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #80 Unopposed MOTION For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement filed by Steven Basile. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1. Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit(s) A. Long Form Notice, #3 Exhibit(s) B. Publication Notice, #4 Proposed Order For Preliminary Approval, #5 Exhibit(s) D. Proposed Order For Final Judgment, #6 Exhibit(s) E. Claim Form, #7 Declaration Steven Weisbrot, Esquire, #8 Declaration Jonathan Shub, Esquire, #9 Exhibit(s) 4. Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C., Resume, #10 Exhibit(s) 5. Marcus & Mack, P.C., Resume)(Frederick, Troy)
January 2, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile Brief in Support to Document 80 as a seperate document. This event can be located under Responses and Replies. (aaa)
December 28, 2017 Filing 80 Unopposed MOTION For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement by Steven Basile. (Attachments: #1 Memo Of Law In Support Of Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement, #2 Exhibit(s) 1. Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit(s) A. Long Form Notice, #4 Exhibit(s) B. Publication Notice, #5 Exhibit(s) C. Proposed Order For Preliminary Approval, #6 Exhibit(s) D. Proposed Final Judgment Order, #7 Exhibit(s) E. Claim Form, #8 Declaration Steven Weisbrot, Esquire, #9 Declaration Jonathan Shub, Esquire, #10 Exhibit(s) 4. Kohn Swift & Graf, P.C. Resume, #11 Exhibit(s) 5. Marcus & Mack, P.C. Resume)(Frederick, Troy)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER - upon consideration of Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion #78 for Leave to File Brief in Excess of 5,000 Words, IT IS ORDERED THAT: (1) the Motion is GRANTED; and (2) Plaintiff is permitted leave to file a Memorandum of Law in Support of His Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement that does not exceed 6,000 words. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/19/17. (rw)
December 18, 2017 Filing 78 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation for Memorandum of Law In Support of The Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Steven Basile. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shub, Jonathan)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Joint Stipulation APPROVED. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/29/17. (rw) (Main Document 77 replaced on 11/30/2017) (rw).
November 28, 2017 Filing 76 STIPULATION 2nd Joint Notice to the Court by Steven Basile, filed by Steven Basile.(Shub, Jonathan)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Order approving Stipulation. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/6/17. (rw)
October 23, 2017 Filing 74 STIPULATION (Joint) To Stay Case Deadlines by Steven Basile. (Shub, Jonathan)
August 14, 2017 Filing 73 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Andrew P. LeGrand, Esq. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/14/17. (rw)
August 11, 2017 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate's counsel bar status verified. (aaa)
August 11, 2017 Filing 72 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Andrew P LeGrand on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Andrew LeGrand is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4168505.. (LeGrand, Andrew)
July 25, 2017 Filing 71 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Harper Segui, Esquire. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/20/17. (rw)
July 14, 2017 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
July 14, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Attorney Harper Segui is seeking special admission. Harper Segui Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4142806. by Steven Basile.(Shub, Jonathan) Modified on 8/14/2017 (rw).
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER - in consideration of the Parties Joint Motion #68 to Modify the Scheduling Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Scheduling Order is modified as follows: 1) Plaintiffs class certification opening brief shall be filed on or before November 30, 2017; 2) Plaintiffs expert report regarding class certification shall be served on or before November 30, 2017; 3) Defendants class certification opposition brief shall be filed on or before January 29, 2018; 4) Defendants expert report regarding class certification shall be served on or before January 29, 2018; 5) Plaintiffs class certification reply brief shall be filed on or before February 28, 2018; 6) All other scheduling deadlines remain in effect. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/14/17 (rw)
July 12, 2017 Filing 68 Joint MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE SCHEDULING ORDER by Steven Basile. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frederick, Troy)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER - upon consideration of the Parties Joint Motion #66 to Modify the Scheduling Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Scheduling Order is modified as follows: 1)Plaintiffs class certification opening brief shall be filed on or beforeSeptember 14, 2017; 2)Plaintiffs expert report regarding class certification shall be served onor before September 14, 2017; 3)Defendants class certification opposition brief shall be filed on orbefore November 14, 2017; 4)Defendants expert report regarding class certification shall be served onor before November 14, 2017; 5)Plaintiffs class certification reply brief shall be filed on or beforeDecember 14, 2017; 6)All other scheduling deadlines remain in effect. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 6/12/17 (rw)
June 7, 2017 Filing 66 MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE SCHEDULING ORDER , filed by Steven Basile. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frederick, Troy)
May 18, 2017 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan S. Neiderhiser on behalf of Steven Basile (Neiderhiser, Bryan)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the #63 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order is GRANTED. Class Certification deadlines are amended. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/1/17. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (sc)
February 23, 2017 Filing 63 Joint MOTION to Modify the Case Scheduling Order by Stream Energy, Stream Energy Pennsylvania, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schwing, Austin)
December 8, 2016 Filing 62 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Austin V. Schwing, Esq.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/8/16. (sc)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Parties proposed scheduling deadlinesare adopted as follows: Plaintiffs class certification opening brief: May 1, 2017. (See ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES) The telephone conference currently scheduled for November 14, 2016 is CANCELLED. A new telephone conference to discuss additional deadlines will be scheduled after the class certification issue has been decided.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/9/16. (sc)
November 3, 2016 Filing 60 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Stream Energy, Stream Energy Pennsylvania, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order)(Walters, Robert)
October 28, 2016 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
October 27, 2016 Filing 59 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Austin V Schwing on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Austin Schwing is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3911224.. (Schwing, Austin)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER LIFTING STAY - IT IS ORDERED THAT the stay in the above-captioned action is lifted and a status telephone conference will be held on November 14, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the conference call.The telephone number of the Court is 717-221-3990.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/17/16. (sc)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 22), is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Count II, Count III, and Count IV are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings (Doc. No. 49), is DENIED. #49 #22 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/6/16. (sc)
September 6, 2016 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/6/16. (sc)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER STAYING CASE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the above action is STAYED pending the Courts disposition of Defendants motion to dismiss andmotion for judgment on the pleadings. The case management conference scheduled for August 24, 2016, is canceled.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/22/16. (sc)
June 28, 2016 Filing 54 REPLY BRIEF re #49 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Stream Energy, Stream Energy Pennsylvania, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unpublished Authorities)(Walters, Robert)
June 28, 2016 Filing 53 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Kevin Laukaitis, Esq.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 6/28/16. (sc)
June 21, 2016 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
June 21, 2016 Filing 52 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by D. Aaron Rihn on behalf of Steven Basile Attorney Kevin Laukaitis is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3791509.. (Rihn, D.)
June 14, 2016 Filing 51 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #49 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Steven Basile. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E)(Shub, Jonathan)
May 31, 2016 Filing 50 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #49 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Stream Energy, Stream Energy Pennsylvania, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unpublished Authorities)(Walters, Robert)
May 31, 2016 Filing 49 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Stream Energy, Stream Energy Pennsylvania, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Walters, Robert)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant may file with this Court aMotion for Judgment on the Pleadings, along with a brief in support, on or before May 31, 2016. Status Conference set for 8/24/2016 at 10:00 AM. Pltf's cnsl shall initiate the call. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/11/16. (sc)
May 6, 2016 Filing 46 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Stream Energy, Stream Energy Pennsylvania, LLC. (Walters, Robert)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Status Conference is set for 5/10/2016 at 9:30 AM before the Honorable Yvette Kane. Signed by the Honorable Yvette Kane on March 8, 2016. (kjn)
March 1, 2016 Filing 44 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Olivia A. Adendorff, Esq.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/1/16. (sc)
February 19, 2016 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
February 19, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory S. Voshell on behalf of Stream Energy, Stream Energy Pennsylvania, LLC (Voshell, Gregory)
February 19, 2016 Filing 42 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Olivia A Adendorff on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Olivia Adendorff is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3679937.. (Adendorff, Olivia)
February 19, 2016 Filing 41 WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Chantel M Kramme terminated on behalf of Defendants. (Kramme, Chantel)
February 4, 2016 Filing 40 WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Prerak Shah terminated on behalf of Defendants. (Shah, Prerak)
January 22, 2016 Filing 39 WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Gregory S. Voshell terminated on behalf of Defendants Stream Energy Pennsylvania, LLC, Stream Energy Pennsylvania, LLC d/b/a Stream Energy, Stream Energy d/b/a Stream Energy Pennsylvania LLC. (Voshell, Gregory)
January 11, 2016 Filing 38 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/7/16. (sc)
January 7, 2016 Filing 36 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Robert C Walters, Esq.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/7/16. (sc)
January 4, 2016 Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Steven Basile. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER)(Shub, Jonathan)
December 28, 2015 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Walters & Associate Counsel Elliott- Bar Status Verified. (ve)
December 23, 2015 Filing 34 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Robert C. Walters on behalf of Stream Energy Pennsylvania, LLC Attorney Walters is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3632453.. (Walters, Robert)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a Case Management Conference is set for 1/7/2016 at 11:30 AM. Pltf's cnsl shall initiate the call. The Joint Case Mgmt Plan is due by 1/1/16. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/21/15. (sc)
October 8, 2015 Filing 32 REPLY BRIEF re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts II, III and IV of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Stream Energy, Stream Energy Pennsylvania, LLC.(Shah, Prerak)
September 23, 2015 Filing 31 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Troy M. Frederick, Esq. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/21/15. (pw)
September 23, 2015 Filing 30 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jonathan Shub, Esq. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/21/15. (pw)
September 23, 2015 Filing 29 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Prerak Shah, Esq. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/21/15. (pw)
September 23, 2015 Filing 28 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Chantel M. Kramer, Esq. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/21/15. (pw)
September 21, 2015 Filing 27 REPLY BRIEF re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts II, III and IV of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Steven Basile. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Proposed Order)(Shub, Jonathan)
September 17, 2015 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorneys and associate's bar status verfied. (aaa)
September 17, 2015 Filing 26 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by D. Aaron Rihn on behalf of Steven Basile Attorney Troy Frederick is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3545862.. (Rihn, D.)
September 17, 2015 Filing 25 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by D. Aaron Rihn on behalf of Steven Basile Attorney Jonathan Shub is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3545856.. (Rihn, D.)
August 31, 2015 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Stream Energy, Stream Energy Pennsylvania, LLC.(Elliott, John)
August 31, 2015 Filing 23 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts II, III and IV of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Stream Energy, Stream Energy Pennsylvania, LLC.(Elliott, John)
August 31, 2015 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counts II, III and IV of Plaintiff's Complaint by Stream Energy, Stream Energy Pennsylvania, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Elliott, John)
August 27, 2015 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney's bar status verified. (aaa)
August 27, 2015 Filing 21 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Prerak Shah on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Prerak Shah is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3527063.. (Shah, Prerak)
August 27, 2015 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verfified. (aaa)
August 26, 2015 Filing 20 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Chantel M Kramme on behalf of Stream Energy, Stream Energy Pennsylvania, LLC Attorney Chantel M. Kramme is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3526236.. (Kramme, Chantel)
August 6, 2015 Filing 19 LETTER addressed to counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/6/15. (sc)
August 4, 2015 Filing 18 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:15-cv-03204 containing electronic documents.
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT, IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATE THAN 30 DAYS AFTER THE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IS DISPOSED OF. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 7/31/15.7/31/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/4/2015.]
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THIS CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 7/31/15.7/31/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/4/2015.]
July 30, 2015 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (UNOPPOSED) filed by STREAM ENERGY, STREAM ENERGY PENNSYLVANIA, LLC.Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(VOSHELL, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/4/2015.]
July 30, 2015 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer (UNOPPOSED) filed by STREAM ENERGY, STREAM ENERGY PENNSYLVANIA, LLC.Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(VOSHELL, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/4/2015.]
July 30, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY S. VOSHELL on behalf of STREAM ENERGY, STREAM ENERGY PENNSYLVANIA, LLC with Certificate of Service(VOSHELL, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/4/2015.]
July 15, 2015 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including SGE Energy Sourcing, LLC, Stream Gas & Electric, Ltd., SGE Management, LLC with Certificate of Service by STREAM ENERGY PENNSYLVANIA, LLC.(ELLIOTT, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/4/2015.]
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ROBERT C. WALTERS, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 7/10/15. 7/13/15 ENTERED AND ECF APPLICATION & COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (ti, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/4/2015.]
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF PRERAK SHAH, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 7/10/15. 7/13/15 ENTERED AND ECF APPLICATION & COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/4/2015.]
July 9, 2015 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ROBERT C. WALTERS, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), Statement and Certificate of Service (Filing fee $40 receipt number 124019) by STREAM ENERGY, STREAM ENERGY PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (ti, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/4/2015.]
July 9, 2015 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF PRERAK SHAH, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b), Statement and Certificate of Service (Filing fee $40 receipt number 124020) by STREAM ENERGY, STREAM ENERGY PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (ti, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/4/2015.]
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 8/3/2015. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 7/6/15.7/6/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/4/2015.]
July 2, 2015 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint with Proposed Order (Exhibit "A") filed by STREAM ENERGY, STREAM ENERGY PENNSYLVANIA, LLC.Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service.(ELLIOTT, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/4/2015.]
July 2, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. ELLIOTT on behalf of STREAM ENERGY, STREAM ENERGY PENNSYLVANIA, LLC with Certificate of Service(ELLIOTT, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/4/2015.]
June 16, 2015 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STEVEN BASILE served Summons and Complaint upon STREAM ENERGY by E-mail on Defendant's Counsel, Prerak Shah of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP. STREAM ENERGY served on 6/16/2015, answer due 7/7/2015. (SHUB, JONATHAN) Modified on 6/17/2015 (afm, ). (FILED IN ERROR, INCOMPLETE PDF) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/4/2015.]
June 16, 2015 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STEVEN BASILE re: Robert DeLacy served Summons and Complaint upon STREAM ENERGY PENNSYLVANIA, LLC by Hand Delivery. STREAM ENERGY PENNSYLVANIA, LLC served on 6/12/2015, answer due 7/6/2015. (SHUB, JONATHAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/4/2015.]
June 9, 2015 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by TROY M. FREDERICK on behalf of STEVEN BASILE (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FREDERICK, TROY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/4/2015.]
June 9, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 122482.), filed by STEVEN BASILE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(tj, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/4/2015.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BASILE v. STREAM ENERGY PENNSYLVANIA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stream Energy Pennsylvania, LLC
Represented By: Chantel M Kramme
Represented By: Robert C. Walters
Represented By: Andrew P LeGrand
Represented By: Prerak Shah
Represented By: Austin V Schwing
Represented By: Gregory S. Voshell
Represented By: Olivia A Adendorff
Represented By: John P. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stream Energy
Represented By: Chantel M Kramme
Represented By: Robert C. Walters
Represented By: Andrew P LeGrand
Represented By: Prerak Shah
Represented By: Austin V Schwing
Represented By: Gregory S. Voshell
Represented By: Olivia A Adendorff
Represented By: John P. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Basile
Represented By: Bryan S. Neiderhiser
Represented By: Troy M. Frederick
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: D. Aaron Rihn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?