Abney v. Basial et al
Plaintiff: Clarence Abney
Defendant: Lisa W. Basial, Whalen, F. Shoop and Jon D. Fisher
Case Number: 1:2016cv00350
Filed: February 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: Martin C. Carlson
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED THAT: Judge Carlsons report and recommendation (Doc. 113) is ADOPTED IN ITS ENTIRETY and Plaintiffs objections to the report and recommendation (Doc. 114) are OVERRULED. Defendants motion for summary judgment (Doc. 93) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in Defendants favor and close this case. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/30/2020. (ve)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - 1. The dfts motion for a stay of discovery (Doc. 48 ) is GRANTED in part. Discovery in this case shall be stayed. 2. The pltfs omnibus motion for discovery relief and for leave to take broad discovery pursuant to Rule 56(d) in order to respond to the dfts motion for summary judgment (Doc. 53 ) is DENIED. 3. The pltf shall file a substantive response to the dfts motion for summary judgment on or before Friday, October 27, 2017. The dfts shall be permitted to fil e a reply brief in further support of their motion on or before Friday, November 10, 2017. 4. The pltfs unopposed motion for an extension of time to complete discovery and to file additional dispositive motions (Doc. 56 ) is GRANTED and the case-ma nagement Order of February 17, 2017, is hereby amended as follows: Close of Fact Discovery: February 28, 2018. Reports of Experts : March 14, 2018. Response Reports to Expert Reports: April 16, 2018. Dispositive Motions and SupportingBriefs Due: May 2, 2018. Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge: May 2, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 6, 2017. (kjn)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. The Court adopts the Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 32), of Magistrate Judge Carlson; 2. The Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 25), is DENIED without prejudice to their ability to renew some or all of their arguments in a properly supported motion for summary judgment; and 3. This matter is referred back to Magistrate Judge Carlson for further pretrial management. 32 25 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/26/2017. (sc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abney v. Basial et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Abney
Represented By: Marianne Sawicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa W. Basial
Represented By: Jessica S. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whalen
Represented By: Jessica S. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Shoop
Represented By: Jessica S. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon D. Fisher
Represented By: Jessica S. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?