Picarella v. Brouse et al
Plaintiff: Charles Picarella, Jr.
Defendant: Krista Brouse, James Smink, Brian Wheary and County of Northumberland
Case Number: 1:2016cv00501
Filed: March 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Centre
Presiding Judge: CA
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). The motion (Doc. 84) is GRANTED. 2. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER judgment in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. 3. Plaintiff's request (Doc. 81) that the court o rder defense counsel to comply with the Department of Corrections policy regarding incoming inmate mail is DISMISSED. 4. Plaintiff's request (Doc. 86) for judgment and sanctions based on defendant's and defense counsels purported nefarious conduct is DISMISSED. 5. Plaintiff's motion (Doc. 99) for referral to alternative dispute resolution is DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/14/2020. (ktt)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying pltf's motion 69 for Rule 11 sanctions. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/8/20. (ki)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying pltf's motion 72 for appt of cnsl without prejudice. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/25/19. (ki)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER (Memorandum 58 filed previously as separate docket entry) DENYING pltf's motion for Rule 11 sanctions 46 without prejudice. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/14/18. (ki)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting pltf's motion 56 to w/draw the motion 52 for entry of default - the motion 52 for entry of default is deemed WITHDRAWN. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/24/18. (ki)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER (Memorandum 49 filed previously as separate docket entry) granting defts' MTD 36 2nd amended complaint in its entirety... (see Paras 1-3 for specifics). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/6/18. (ki)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER (Memorandum 33 filed previously as separate docket entry) GRANTING IN PART & DENYING IN PART as follows... (see Paras 1a-e for specific details), granting pltf 20 days to file proposed 2nd amended complaint to cure deficiencies w/ re: 8th Ame nd conditions of confinement claim & Monell claim w/ failure to file same will result in dismissal of the action..., & directing pltf to file brief in opp to any MTD any 2nd complaint, should defts file one, w/in 14 days after svc of defts' brief. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/2/17. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Picarella v. Brouse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Picarella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krista Brouse
Represented By: Michael J. Domanish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Smink
Represented By: Michael J. Domanish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Wheary
Represented By: Michael J. Domanish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Northumberland
Represented By: Michael J. Domanish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?