Tereo v. Smuck et al
Plaintiff: Eric D. Tereo
Defendant: Darryl L. Smuck, II and Southern Regional Police Department
Case Number: 1:2016cv01436
Filed: July 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER (Memorandum 77 filed previously as separate docket entry) DENYING deft Smuck's motion 68 for reconsideration of 9/17/18 memo 64 & order 65 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 7/9/19. (ki)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting deft Smuck's MIL 60 - pltf precluded from offering any evidence of mental illness, injury, disease or depression as result of 11/19/13 incident @ trial. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/17/18. (ki)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting pltf's motion 58 to stay pretrial & trial ddls, generally, pending disposition of MSJs. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/20/17. (ki)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER (Memorandum 31 filed previously as separate docket entry) GRANTING in Part & DENYING in part defts' MTD 11 ... (see Paras 1a-b for specifics), granting Tereo leave to amend pleading w/in 20 days of date of this order, DENYING defts' motion for sanctions 24 , LIFTING 2/28/17 stay 30 , & noting Clrk of Ct will issue revised pretrial & trial schedule by separate order. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/15/17. (ki)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tereo v. Smuck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric D. Tereo
Represented By: Devon M. Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl L. Smuck, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Regional Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?