Parno v. Kane et al
Plaintiff: Glenn A. Parno
Defendant: Kathleen Kane, Renee Martin, David Peifer, Braden Cook and William Nemetz
Case Number: 1:2016cv01949
Filed: September 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: John E. Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM re. Letter/Motion to compel (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/23/19. (ma)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting pltf's mtn to compel 43 . Mr. Shapiro and the OAG shall produce the documents, information, and/or objects demanded by the subpoena, within the date range of 3/1/14 through 8/24/16, to Pltf within (60) days of the date of this order under penalty of contempt.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 5/8/18. (ma)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting pltf's mtn to compel 28 . Mr. Steele shall produce thedocuments, information, and/or objects demanded by the subpoena to Pltfwithin (20) days of the date of this order under penalty of contemptSigned by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 11/30/17. (ma) (Main Document 35 replaced on 11/30/2017) (ma).
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: In accord with the accompanying Memorandum 33 ; Dfts' mtn to dismiss the amended complaint 15 is Granted in parte and Denied in part as follows: Granted as to Count2 with prejudice, Denied as to Count 1.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 11/9/17. (ma)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parno v. Kane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn A. Parno
Represented By: Daniel K. Natirboff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Peifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Braden Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Nemetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?