Burton v. Wetzel et al
Plaintiff: Niara Burton
Defendant: John Wetzel, Brenda Tritt, Trevor Winguard, Michael Harlow, Sinicky, Daramo, Sparks, Mark Phillipi, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Manes and Kropp
Case Number: 1:2016cv01953
Filed: September 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Schuylkill
Presiding Judge: Susan E. Schwab
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 83 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by David Radziewicz, Sinicky, Valarie Kusiak, Brownawell, Mark Phillipi, Paul Noel, Brenda Tritt, Kropp, Manes, Kelly Czopek, Trevor Winguard, CJ McKean, Michael Harlow, Sparks, Linda Chismar, Tom McGinley, John Wetzel, Al Joseph, Daramo. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on November 6, 2018. (kjn)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) For the reasons expressed in the accompanying Memorandum (doc. 81), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants' motion for attorneys fees (doc. 60)is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 8/14/2018. (ktt)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION - For the forgoing reasons, the plTfs motion for preliminary injunction, (Doc. 30 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renewal of this motion on a de novo standard of review before the presiding judge in this case, Chief Magistrate Ju dge Schwab, at a later date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plTfs motion to strike designation of deposition excerpts in connection with this preliminary injunction motion, (Doc. 53 ) is DISMISSED as moot in light of our ruling on this motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 27, 2017. (kjn)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 36 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Niara Burton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 26, 2017. (kjn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. Wetzel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niara Burton
Represented By: Alexander R. Bilus
Represented By: Alexandra T Morgan-Kurtz
Represented By: Joshua W.B. Richards
Represented By: Sara J. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wetzel
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Represented By: Maria G. Macus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Tritt
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Represented By: Maria G. Macus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Winguard
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Represented By: Maria G. Macus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Harlow
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Represented By: Maria G. Macus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinicky
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Represented By: Maria G. Macus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daramo
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Represented By: Maria G. Macus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sparks
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Represented By: Maria G. Macus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Phillipi
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Represented By: Maria G. Macus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manes
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Represented By: Maria G. Macus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kropp
Represented By: Joseph G. Fulginiti
Represented By: Maria G. Macus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?