Dougherty et al v. Dupes et al
Plaintiff: Keith Dougherty, Brent Frey, Erica Frey and R. Michael Best
Defendant: Jared Dupes, Commonwealth Court Clerk, Christopher Conner, Caldwell, Jones, Carlson, Blewit, Welsh, PA Unified Judiciary, Jerome B. Simandle and David M Ragonese
Case Number: 1:2017cv01541
Filed: August 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: Martin C. Carlson
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/15/20. (ao)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 188 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 3/13/19 (Conti, Joy)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), Motions terminated: 152 MOTION for Reconsideration Default under Hamer filed by Keith Dougherty, 156 MOTION for Reconsideration, 150 First MOTION for Reconsideratio n "Appointments Clause Violation" filed by Keith Dougherty, 160 MOTION for Hearing Rule 55 "declaratory judgment" Unoposed filed by Keith Dougherty, 154 MOTION for Reconsideration 1682 Colonial Law filed by Keith Dougherty are DENIED.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 12/4/2018. (jw)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - all defendants having been dismissed from this action, all remaining pending motions are denied as moot and the clerk is ordered to mark this case closed. (See order for details)Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 08/15/2018. (jw)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 4/6/2018. (jw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dougherty et al v. Dupes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Michael Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Dupes
Represented By: Caleb Curtis Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Court Clerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caldwell, Jones, Carlson, Blewit, Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA Unified Judiciary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome B. Simandle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M Ragonese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?