Corman et al v. Torres et al Featured Case

Eight House Republicans from Pennsylvania, among others, filed a lawsuit to block Pennsylvania from using the new congressional map put in place by the Pennsylvania Supreme Court in League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania v. Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. The suit contends that the supreme court's actions violate the Elections Clause of the US Constitution by requiring that any map adopted during the remedial process comply with redistricting criteria specified in the court’s order. The plaintiffs also argue that the court failed to give lawmakers adequate time to adopt a remedial plan.

Plaintiff: Jacob Corman, Michael Folmer, Lou Barletta, Ryan Costello, Mike Kelly, Tom Marino, Scott Perry, Keith Rothfus, Lloyd Smucker and Glenn Thompson
Defendant: Robert Torres and Jonathan M. Marks
Amicus: Brian McCann, National Democratic Redistricting Committee, League of Women Voters of Pennyslvania, Republican Caucus of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives, Common Cause, Campaign Legal Center, Susan American Civil Rights Union and Guy Reschenthaler
Intervenor_defendant: Carmen Febo San Miguel, James Solomon, John Greiner, John Capowski, Gretchen Brandt, Thomas Rentschler, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, Lisa Issacs, Don Lancaster, Jordi Comas, Robert Smith, William Marx, Richard Mantell, Priscilla McNulty, Thomas Ulrich, Robert McKinstry, Mark Lichty and Lorraine Petrosky
Case Number: 1:2018cv00443
Filed: February 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Dauphin
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Referring Judge: Kent A Jordan
2 Judge: Jerome B. Simandle
Nature of Suit: State Reapportionment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2018 Filing 143 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL (FRAP 4(a)4 Amendment) as to 140 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion for Reconsideration filed by Jeffrey Cutler. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments, # 2 Attachments)(pjr)
April 13, 2018 Receipt of payment from JEFFREY CUTLER in the amount of $505.00 for NOTICE OF APPEAL/DOCKETING FEE. Transaction posted on 4/12/2018. Receipt number 111021992 processed by aarlidge. (jjs, )
April 12, 2018 Filing 141 NOTICE OF APPEAL in PRO SE NON PRISONER Case as to 140 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion for Reconsideration. Filing Fee and Docket Fee PAID. Filing fee $ 505 Receipt Number: 111021992. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (aaa)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER re: motion 139 to intervene as pltf & for reconsideration filed pro se by Jeffrey Cutler - It is hereby ORDERED that Cutler's motion 139 to intervene as pltf & for reconsideration is DENIED with prejudice. (See order for complete details.) Signed by USCA 3rd Circuit Judge Kent A. Jordan, Chief Judge USDC MDPA Christopher C. Conner & District Judge USDC NJ Jerome B. Simandle on 4/10/18. (ki)
April 3, 2018 Filing 139 MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiff and MOTION to Reconsider filed by Jeffrey Cutler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Exhibit(s) Continued)(ve) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2018: # 3 Main Doc) (aaa).
March 19, 2018 Filing 138 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of oral argument hearing held on 9 March 2018 before Judges Jordan, Conner, and Simandle. Court Reporter: Wesley J. Armstrong, RMR (contact @ "wesley_armstrong@pamd.uscourts.gov"). Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/ Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2018.
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER (Memorandum 136 filed previously as separate docket entry) - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The Executive Defendants' motion to dismiss 87 & the Intervenor-Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings 90 are GRANTED.; 2. The Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction 3 is DENIED.; and 3. The Plaintiffs' verified complaint 1 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (See order for complete details.) Signed by USCA 3rd Circuit Judge Kent A. Jordan, Chief Judge USDC MDPA Christopher C. Conner & District Judge USDC NJ Jerome B. Simandle on 3/19/18. (ki)
March 19, 2018 Filing 136 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re: 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael Folmer, Jacob Corman, 87 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres, 1 Verified Complaint, filed by Tom Marino, Keith Rothfus, Mike Kelly, Ryan Costello, Michael Folmer, Lou Barletta, Scott Perry, Lloyd Smucker, Glenn Thompson, Jacob Corman, & 90 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Thomas Ulrich, Mark Lichty, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, Thomas Rentschler, John Capowski, Gretchen Brandt, Don Lancaster, William Marx, Robert Smith, John Greiner, Richard Mantell, James Solomon, Lisa Issacs, Robert McKinstry, Lorraine Petrosky, Priscilla McNulty, Carmen Febo San Miguel, Jordi Comas. (See memo for complete details.) Signed by USCA 3rd Circuit Judge Kent A. Jordan, Chief Judge USDC MDPA Christopher C. Conner & District Judge USDC NJ Jerome B. Simandle on 3/19/18. (ki) (Main Document 136 replaced on 3/22/2018) (fs).
March 12, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Andrew Bergman, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
March 9, 2018 Filing 134 SUR REPLY to REPLY to Response to Motion re 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2)(Aronchick, Mark)
March 9, 2018 Filing 133 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Andrew David Bergman, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/9/18. (ki)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting motion 129 for leave to file sur-reply to pltfs' reply in further support of preliminary injunction - defts directed to file sur-reply & accompanying affidavit on the docket. (See order for complete details.) Signed by USCA 3rd Circuit Judge Kent A. Jordan, Chief Judge USDC MDPA Christopher C. Conner & District Judge USDC NJ Jerome B. Simandle on 3/9/18. (ki)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting motion 130 for leave to participate as Amicus Curiae filed by Movant, Senator Guy Reschenthaler of the Senate of Pennsylvania - Amicus Curiae is hereby granted leave to file its brief. (See order for complete details.) Signed by USCA 3rd Circuit Judge Kent A. Jordan, Chief Judge USDC MDPA Christopher C. Conner & District Judge USDC NJ Jerome B. Simandle on 3/9/18. (ki)
March 9, 2018 Filing 130 MOTION for Leave to Participate as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Guy Reschenthaler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Proposed Order)(pjr)
March 8, 2018 Filing 129 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in response to Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Preliminary Injunction by Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres.(Aronchick, Mark)
March 8, 2018 Filing 128 Letter from Counsel to Intervenor Defendants regarding March 9, 2018 hearing. (Schmidt, Thomas)
March 8, 2018 Filing 127 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Gretchen Brandt, John Capowski, Jordi Comas, John Greiner, Lisa Issacs, Don Lancaster, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, Mark Lichty, Richard Mantell, William Marx, Robert McKinstry, Priscilla McNulty, Carmen Febo San Miguel, Lorraine Petrosky, Thomas Rentschler, Robert Smith, James Solomon, Thomas Ulrich. Amendment to 122 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice, signed Code of Professional Conduct. (Bergman, Andrew)
March 8, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a signed Code of Professional Conduct for Doc. 122. (pjr)
March 8, 2018 Filing 126 REPLY BRIEF re 87 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Unpublished Opinion(s) Unpublished Opinion)(Aronchick, Mark)
March 8, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Elisabeth Theodore, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
March 8, 2018 Filing 125 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (In Re: Scheduling Conference & Oral Argument on Motions) held on 3/1/18 before Judges Jordan, Conner, and Simandle. Court Reporter L. Shuey, Telephone Number 717-215-1270. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2018. (ctrep1, )
March 8, 2018 Filing 124 REPLY BRIEF re 90 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Gretchen Brandt, John Capowski, Jordi Comas, John Greiner, Lisa Issacs, Don Lancaster, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, Mark Lichty, Richard Mantell, William Marx, Robert McKinstry, Priscilla McNulty, Carmen Febo San Miguel, Lorraine Petrosky, Thomas Rentschler, Robert Smith, James Solomon, Thomas Ulrich.(Schmidt, Thomas)
March 8, 2018 Filing 123 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Elisabeth S. Theodore, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/8/18. (sc)
March 8, 2018 Filing 122 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Andrew D Bergman on behalf of Gretchen Brandt, John Capowski, Jordi Comas, John Greiner, Lisa Issacs, Don Lancaster, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, Mark Lichty, Richard Mantell, William Marx, Robert McKinstry, Priscilla McNulty, Carmen Febo San Miguel, Lorraine Petrosky, Thomas Rentschler, Robert Smith, James Solomon, Thomas Ulrich Attorney Andrew Bergman is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4360460.. (Bergman, Andrew)
March 7, 2018 Filing 121 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Plaintiff's Mtn for TRO & Prel Injunction re 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , 119 First MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Susan American Civil Rights Union. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Ex A, # 2 Exhibit(s) Ex B, # 3 Exhibit(s) Ex C, # 4 Exhibit(s) Ex D)(Kerns, Linda)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting motion 119 for leave to file amicus curiae brief by movant, American Civil Rights Union - Amicus Curiae American Civil Rights Union is granted leave to file its proposed Amicus Curiae brief. (See order for complete details.) Signed by USCA 3rd Circuit Judge Kent A. Jordan, Chief Judge USDC MDPA Christopher C. Conner & District Judge USDC NJ Jerome B. Simandle on 3/7/18. (ki)
March 7, 2018 Filing 119 First MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Susan American Civil Rights Union. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Brief, # 2 Exhibit(s) Ex. A, # 3 Exhibit(s) Ex. B, # 4 Exhibit(s) Ex. C, # 5 Exhibit(s) Ex. D)(Kerns, Linda)
March 7, 2018 Filing 118 REPLY BRIEF re 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lou Barletta, Ryan Costello, Mike Kelly, Tom Marino, Scott Perry, Keith Rothfus, Lloyd Smucker, Glenn Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Haverstick, Matthew)
March 7, 2018 Filing 117 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 87 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , 90 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Lou Barletta, Ryan Costello, Mike Kelly, Tom Marino, Scott Perry, Keith Rothfus, Lloyd Smucker, Glenn Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Haverstick, Matthew)
March 6, 2018 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by National Democratic Redistricting Committee as Amicus Curiae. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - Declaration of Marc Friedenberg, # 2 Exhibit(s) B - Declaration of Christina Hartman, # 3 Exhibit(s) C - Declaration of Madeleine Dean)(Spiva, Bruce)
March 6, 2018 Filing 115 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Shawn T. Sheehy, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/5/2018. (sc)
March 6, 2018 Filing 114 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jason Adam Snyderman, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/5/2018. (sc)
March 6, 2018 Filing 113 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Michael D. Silberfarb, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/5/2018. (sc)
March 6, 2018 Filing 112 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Phillip M. Gordon, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/5/18. (sc)
March 6, 2018 Filing 111 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Colleen E. Roh Sinzdak, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/5/2018. (sc)
March 6, 2018 Filing 110 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Michael Churchill, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/5/2018. (sc)
March 6, 2018 Filing 109 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Thomas Payne Schmidt, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/5/2018. (sc)
March 6, 2018 Filing 108 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Neal Katyal, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/5/2018. (sc)
March 6, 2018 Filing 107 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Reedy C. Swanson, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/5/18. (sc)
March 6, 2018 Filing 106 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Sara Solow, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/5/18. (sc)
March 6, 2018 Filing 105 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Uzoma Nkwonta, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/5/18. (sc)
March 6, 2018 Filing 104 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Ruth M. Greenwood, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/5/2018. (sc)
March 6, 2018 Filing 103 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Annabelle E. Harless, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/5/2018. (sc)
March 6, 2018 Filing 102 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Paul M. Smith, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/5/18. (sc)
March 6, 2018 Filing 101 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Mitchell P. Reich, Esq.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/5/18. (sc)
March 5, 2018 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Campaign Legal Center Amicus Curiae Brief of Campaign Legal Center in Support of Defendants and Intervenor-Defendants; Certificate of Service. (Snyder, Joshua)
March 5, 2018 Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Common Cause as Amicus Curiae. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Thomas)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting plaintiffs' motion 93 for leave to file omnibus briefs & any response thereto - plaintiffs granted leave to file single brief in opposition to pending motion to dismiss & motion for jdgmt on pleadings 87 90 totalling 15,000 words, plaintiffs granted leave to file single reply brief re: motion for prelimin injunction 2 totalling 10,000 words w/ foregoing briefs to be filed by 12:00 p.m. on 3/7/18. (See order for complete details.) Signed by USCA 3rd Circuit Judge Kent A. Jordan, Chief Judge USDC MDPA Christopher C. Conner & District Judge USDC NJ Jerome B. Simandle on 3/5/18. (ki)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting motion 81 for leave to file amicus curiae brief by movant Campaign Legal Center - amicus curiae Campaign Legal Center is hereby granted leave to file its proposed amicus curiae brief. (See order for complete details.) Signed by USCA 3rd Circuit Judge Kent A. Jordan, Chief Judge USDC MDPA Christopher C. Conner & District Judge USDC NJ Jerome B. Simandle on 3/5/18. (ki) Modified on 3/5/2018 (ki).
March 5, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners, Elisabeth Theodore, Mitchell Reich, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting motion 80 for leave to participate as Amicus Curiae, filed by Movant, Common Cause - Amicus Curiae is granted leave to file its brief. (See order for complete details.) Signed by USCA 3rd Circuit Judge Kent A. Jordan, Chief Judge USDC MDPA Christopher C. Conner & District Judge USDC NJ Jerome B. Simandle on 3/5/18. (ki)
March 5, 2018 Filing 95 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Mitchell P Reich on behalf of Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres Attorney Mitchell P. Reich is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4356755.. (Reich, Mitchell)
March 5, 2018 Filing 94 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Thomas B. Schmidt, III on behalf of Gretchen Brandt, John Capowski, Jordi Comas, John Greiner, Lisa Issacs, Don Lancaster, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, Mark Lichty, Richard Mantell, William Marx, Robert McKinstry, Priscilla McNulty, Carmen Febo San Miguel, Lorraine Petrosky, Thomas Rentschler, Robert Smith, James Solomon, Thomas Ulrich Attorney Elisabeth Theodore is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4356525.. (Schmidt, Thomas)
March 5, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners, Paul Smith, Annabelle Harless, Ruth Greenwood, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
March 4, 2018 Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Omnibus Briefs by Lou Barletta, Ryan Costello, Mike Kelly, Tom Marino, Scott Perry, Keith Rothfus, Lloyd Smucker, Glenn Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Voss, Joshua)
March 2, 2018 Filing 92 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit(s) A, # 3 Exhibit(s) B, # 4 Exhibit(s) C, # 5 Exhibit(s) D, # 6 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Aronchick, Mark)
March 2, 2018 Filing 91 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 90 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Gretchen Brandt, John Capowski, Jordi Comas, John Greiner, Lisa Issacs, Don Lancaster, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, Mark Lichty, Richard Mantell, William Marx, Robert McKinstry, Priscilla McNulty, Carmen Febo San Miguel, Lorraine Petrosky, Thomas Rentschler, Robert Smith, James Solomon, Thomas Ulrich.(Schmidt, Thomas)
March 2, 2018 Filing 90 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Gretchen Brandt, John Capowski, Jordi Comas, John Greiner, Lisa Issacs, Don Lancaster, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, Mark Lichty, Richard Mantell, William Marx, Robert McKinstry, Priscilla McNulty, Carmen Febo San Miguel, Lorraine Petrosky, Thomas Rentschler, Robert Smith, James Solomon, Thomas Ulrich. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Thomas)
March 2, 2018 Filing 89 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction filed by Gretchen Brandt, John Capowski, Jordi Comas, John Greiner, Lisa Issacs, Don Lancaster, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, Mark Lichty, Richard Mantell, William Marx, Robert McKinstry, Priscilla McNulty, Carmen Febo San Miguel, Lorraine Petrosky, Thomas Rentschler, Robert Smith, James Solomon, Thomas Ulrich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Schmidt, Thomas)
March 2, 2018 Filing 88 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 87 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Unpublished Opinion(s) Unpublished Opinions)(Aronchick, Mark)
March 2, 2018 Filing 87 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Aronchick, Mark)
March 2, 2018 Filing 86 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Campaign Legal Center. Amendment to 81 MOTION for Leave to File AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF Corrected Proposed Order. (Snyder, Joshua)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: 1. The motion 5 to intervene filed by the League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania and eighteen individual Pennsylvania voters is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows:a. The mtn 5 is GRANTED as to the eighteen individual Pennsylvania voters.b. The mtn 5 is DENIED as to the League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania.2. The mtn 12 to intervene filed by the National Democratic Redistricting Committee is DENIED.3. Both the League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania and the National Democratic Redistricting Committee are granted leave to file amici curiae briefs stating their respective positions on the matters raised sub judice.4. Any amici curiae briefs submitted pursuant to pgph 3 shall be filed no later than 12:00 p.m. on 3/7/18.5. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to add the following individuals as intervenor-defendants in the above-captioned action: Carmen Febo San Miguel; James Solomon; John Greiner; John Capowski; Gretchen Brandt; Thomas Rentschler; Mary Elizabeth Lawn; Lisa Isaacs; Don Lancaster; Jordi Comas; Robert Smith; William Marx; Richard Mantell; Priscilla McNulty; Thomas Ulrich; Robert McKinstry; Mark Lichty; and Lorraine Petrosky. Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/2/18. (ma)
March 2, 2018 Filing 84 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Paul M. Smith on behalf of Campaign Legal Center Attorney Paul Smith is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4356165.. (Smith, Paul)
March 2, 2018 Filing 83 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Annabelle E Harless on behalf of Campaign Legal Center Attorney Annabelle E. Harless is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4356163.. (Harless, Annabelle)
March 2, 2018 Filing 82 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Ruth M Greenwood on behalf of Campaign Legal Center Attorney Ruth Greenwood is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4356154.. (Greenwood, Ruth)
March 2, 2018 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to File AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Campaign Legal Center.(Snyder, Joshua)
March 2, 2018 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Common Cause. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Unpublished Opinion(s), # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Thomas)
March 2, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners, Sara Solow, Uzoma Nkwonta, and Associate Counsel bar status verified.(pjr)
March 2, 2018 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Republican Caucus of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives Brief of Amicus Curiae. (Corey, Rodney)
March 2, 2018 Filing 78 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Uzoma Nkwonta on behalf of National Democratic Redistricting Committee Attorney Uzoma Nkwonta is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4355774.. (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
March 2, 2018 Filing 77 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Sara A Solow on behalf of Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres Attorney Sara Solow is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4355739.. (Solow, Sara)
March 2, 2018 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brian McCann re 66 Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Injunction (Warren, Rebecca)
March 2, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Reedy Swanson, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
March 2, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a certificate of service for Doc. 66. (pjr)
March 2, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners, Colleen Sinzdak, Thomas Schmidt, Michael Churchill, Neal Katyal, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
March 2, 2018 Filing 75 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Reedy C Swanson on behalf of Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres Attorney Reedy Swanson is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4355515.. (Swanson, Reedy)
March 2, 2018 Filing 74 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Neal Katyal on behalf of Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres Attorney Neal Katyal is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4355371.. (Katyal, Neal)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting motion 38 for leave to participate as Amicus Curiae by Movant, the Republican Caucus of the PA House of Representatives - Amicus Curiae is granted leave to file its brief. (See order for complete details.) Signed by USCA 3rd Circuit Judge Kent A. Jordan, Chief Judge USDC MDPA Christopher C. Conner & District Judge USDC NJ Jerome B. Simandle on 3/2/18. (ki)
March 2, 2018 Filing 72 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Thomas P Schmidt on behalf of Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres Attorney Thomas Schmidt is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4355340.. (Schmidt, Thomas)
March 2, 2018 Filing 71 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Marc Erik Elias, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/28/18. (ki)
March 2, 2018 Filing 70 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Mary M. McKenzie, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/28/18. (ki)
March 2, 2018 Filing 69 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Sara Murphy, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/28/18. (ki)
March 2, 2018 Filing 68 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jason B. Torchinsky, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/28/18. (ki)
March 1, 2018 Filing 66 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Brian McCann.(Warren, Rebecca)
March 1, 2018 Filing 65 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Michael Churchill on behalf of Gretchen Brandt, John Capowski, Jordi Comas, John Greiner, Lisa Issacs, Don Lancaster, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, League of Women Voters of Pennyslvania, Mark Lichty, Richard Mantell, William Marx, Robert McKinstry, Priscilla McNulty, Carmen Febo San Miguel, Lorraine Petrosky, Thomas Rentschler, Robert Smith, James Solomon, Thomas Ulrich Attorney Michael Churchill is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4354978.. (Churchill, Michael)
March 1, 2018 Filing 62 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Colleen E Roh Sinzdak on behalf of Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres Attorney Colleen Sinzdak is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4354519.. (Roh Sinzdak, Colleen)
March 1, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: LOCATION for 3/1/18 HEARING is CHANGED TO COURTROOM #1, 9th Floor, Fed Bldg, Harrisburg. (ki)
February 28, 2018 Filing 67 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Paul G. Gagne, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/28/18. (ki)
February 28, 2018 Filing 64 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to R. Stanton Jones, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/28/18. (ki)
February 28, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney admission verified for Michael Silberfarb. (aaa)
February 28, 2018 Filing 61 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Michael D Silberfarb on behalf of Jacob Corman, Michael Folmer Attorney Michael Silberfarb is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4353592., filed by on behalf of Jacob Corman, Michael Folmer.(Silberfarb, Michael)
February 28, 2018 Filing 60 Letter from Mark A. Aronchick . (Aronchick, Mark)
February 28, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Bar status verified for Jason Adam Snyderman and Brian S. Paszamant. (aaa)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting pltfs' motion 44 for leave to file over-length brief & leave to file reply brief & any response thereto - the body of pltf' br in opp to any MTD shall contain no more than 7500 words, pltfs permitted to fiel reply br in further supp of motion for prelim inj 2 - the foregoing brs shall by filed by 12:00 pm on 3/7/18. (See order for complete details.) Signed by USCA 3rd Circuit Judge Kent A. Jordan, Chief Judge USDC MDPA Christopher C. Conner & District Judge USDC NJ Jerome B. Simandle on 2/28/18. (ki)
February 28, 2018 Filing 58 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Caitlin M. Foley, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/28/18. (ki)
February 28, 2018 Filing 57 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Brian Simmonds Marshall, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/27/18. (ki)
February 28, 2018 Filing 56 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Bruce V. Spiva, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/27/18. (ki)
February 28, 2018 Filing 55 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jason A. Snyderman on behalf of Jacob Corman, Michael Folmer Attorney Jason Snyderman is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4352880., filed by on behalf of Jacob Corman, Michael Folmer.(Snyderman, Jason)
February 28, 2018 Filing 54 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Benjamin D. Geffen, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/26/18. (ki)
February 28, 2018 Filing 53 EXHIBIT A by National Democratic Redistricting Committee re 52 Reply Brief. (Yu, Kay)
February 28, 2018 Filing 52 REPLY BRIEF re 12 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant filed by National Democratic Redistricting Committee.(Yu, Kay)
February 28, 2018 Filing 51 REPLY BRIEF re 12 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant, 5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres.(Aronchick, Mark)
February 28, 2018 Filing 50 REPLY BRIEF re 5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Gretchen Brandt, John Capowski, Jordi Comas, John Greiner, Lisa Issacs, Don Lancaster, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, League of Women Voters of Pennyslvania, Mark Lichty, Richard Mantell, William Marx, Robert McKinstry, Priscilla McNulty, Carmen Febo San Miguel, Lorraine Petrosky, Thomas Rentschler, Robert Smith, James Solomon, Thomas Ulrich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E)(Schmidt, Thomas)
February 28, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Phillip Gordon, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
February 28, 2018 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE of Service by Lou Barletta, Jacob Corman, Ryan Costello, Michael Folmer, Mike Kelly, Tom Marino, Scott Perry, Keith Rothfus, Lloyd Smucker, Glenn Thompson re 33 Brief in Opposition, . (Paszamant, Brian)
February 28, 2018 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE of Service by Lou Barletta, Jacob Corman, Ryan Costello, Michael Folmer, Mike Kelly, Tom Marino, Scott Perry, Keith Rothfus, Lloyd Smucker, Glenn Thompson re 31 Brief in Opposition, . (Paszamant, Brian)
February 28, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorneys-Marc Elias, Mary McKenzie and Sara Murphy verified. Associate counsel Kay Yu and Thomas Schmidt also verified. (aaa) Modified on 2/28/2018 (aaa). Modified on 2/28/2018 (aaa).
February 28, 2018 Filing 47 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Sara K Murphy on behalf of Gretchen Brandt, John Capowski, Jordi Comas, John Greiner, Lisa Issacs, Don Lancaster, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, League of Women Voters of Pennyslvania, Mark Lichty, Richard Mantell, William Marx, Robert McKinstry, Priscilla McNulty, Carmen Febo San Miguel, Lorraine Petrosky, Thomas Rentschler, Robert Smith, James Solomon, Thomas Ulrich Attorney Sara Murphy is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4352021.. (Murphy, Sara)
February 27, 2018 Filing 46 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Mary M McKenzie on behalf of Robert Smith, Carmen Febo San Miguel, Lisa Issacs, Robert McKinstry, Richard Mantell, League of Women Voters of Pennyslvania, Thomas Rentschler, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, Mark Lichty, William Marx, John Greiner, James Solomon, Priscilla McNulty, Thomas Ulrich, Gretchen Brandt, Jordi Comas, Lorraine Petrosky, Don Lancaster, John Capowski Attorney Mary McKenzie is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4351995., filed by on behalf of Robert Smith, Carmen Febo San Miguel, Lisa Issacs, Robert McKinstry, Richard Mantell, League of Women Voters of Pennyslvania, Thomas Rentschler, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, Mark Lichty, William Marx, John Greiner, James Solomon, Priscilla McNulty, Thomas Ulrich, Gretchen Brandt, Jordi Comas, Lorraine Petrosky, Don Lancaster, John Capowski.(McKenzie, Mary)
February 27, 2018 Filing 45 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Marc E Elias on behalf of National Democratic Redistricting Committee Attorney Marc Elias is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4351859.. (Elias, Marc)
February 27, 2018 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Over-Length Brief and Reply Brief by Lou Barletta, Ryan Costello, Mike Kelly, Tom Marino, Scott Perry, Keith Rothfus, Lloyd Smucker, Glenn Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Voss, Joshua)
February 27, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy E. Gates on behalf of Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres (Gates, Timothy)
February 27, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M Kotula on behalf of Robert Torres, Jonathan M. Marks (Kotula, Kathleen) Modified on 2/27/2018 (ve).
February 27, 2018 Receipt of payment from PEPPER HAMILTON LLP in the amount of $50.00 for PRO HOC VICE. Transaction posted on 2/26/2018. Receipt number 111021760 processed by bdanilow. (jjs, )
February 27, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, R. Stanton Jones, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
February 27, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners, Caitlin Foley and Paul Gagne, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
February 27, 2018 Filing 41 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Thomas B. Schmidt, III on behalf of Gretchen Brandt, John Capowski, Jordi Comas, John Greiner, Lisa Issacs, Don Lancaster, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, League of Women Voters of Pennyslvania, Mark Lichty, Richard Mantell, William Marx, Robert McKinstry, Priscilla McNulty, Carmen Febo San Miguel, Lorraine Petrosky, Thomas Rentschler, Robert Smith, James Solomon, Thomas Ulrich Attorney R. Stanton Jones is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4351347.. (Schmidt, Thomas)
February 27, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Phillip Gordon, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
February 27, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a certificate of service for Doc. 33. (pjr)
February 27, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Shawn Sheehy, and Associate Counsel bar status verified (pjr)
February 27, 2018 Filing 40 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Paul G. Gagne on behalf of Lou Barletta, Ryan Costello, Mike Kelly, Tom Marino, Scott Perry, Keith Rothfus, Lloyd Smucker, Glenn Thompson Attorney Paul Gagne is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4351341.. (Gagne, Paul)
February 27, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a certificate of service for Doc. 31. (pjr)
February 27, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Jason Torchinsky, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
February 27, 2018 Filing 39 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Caitlin M Foley on behalf of National Democratic Redistricting Committee Attorney Caitlin M. Foley is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4351326.. (Foley, Caitlin)
February 27, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Republican Caucus of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives.(Corey, Rodney)
February 27, 2018 Filing 37 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Daniel Jacobson, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/27/18. (ki)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting defts' motion 26 for leave to file brief in excess of word limit in opposition to preliminary injunction. (See order for complete details.) Signed by USCA 3rd Circuit Judge Kent A. Jordan, Chief Judge USDC MDPA Christopher C. Conner & District Judge USDC NJ Jerome B. Simandle on 2/27/18. (ki)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting defts' motion 25 for leave to file brief in excess of word limit in supp of MTD. (See order for complete details.) Signed by USCA 3rd Circuit Judge Kent A. Jordan, Chief Judge USDC MDPA Christopher C. Conner & District Judge USDC NJ Jerome B. Simandle on 2/27/18. (ki)
February 27, 2018 Filing 34 Code of Conduct by Jacob Corman, Michael Folmer. 24 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice . (Gordon, Phillip)
February 27, 2018 Filing 33 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 12 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant filed by Lou Barletta, Jacob Corman, Ryan Costello, Michael Folmer, Mike Kelly, Tom Marino, Scott Perry, Keith Rothfus, Lloyd Smucker, Glenn Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Paszamant, Brian)
February 27, 2018 Filing 32 Code of Conduct by Jacob Corman, Michael Folmer. 23 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice . (Sheehy, Shawn)
February 27, 2018 Filing 31 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re 5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Lou Barletta, Jacob Corman, Ryan Costello, Michael Folmer, Mike Kelly, Tom Marino, Scott Perry, Keith Rothfus, Lloyd Smucker, Glenn Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Paszamant, Brian)
February 27, 2018 Filing 30 Code of Conduct by Jacob Corman, Michael Folmer. 22 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice . (Torchinsky, Jason)
February 27, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners, Brian Marshall, Bruce Spiva, and Associate Counsel bar status verified (pjr)
February 27, 2018 Filing 29 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Brian S Marshall on behalf of National Democratic Redistricting Committee Attorney Brian Simmonds Marshall is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4350851.. (Marshall, Brian)
February 27, 2018 Filing 28 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Bruce V Spiva on behalf of National Democratic Redistricting Committee Attorney Bruce Spiva is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4350718.. (Spiva, Bruce)
February 27, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorneys Sheehy, Torchinsky and Gordon are advised to refile PAGE 3 ONLY of Docs. 22, 23 & 24 listing associate counsel in question #2. Counsel is additionally advised to file a signed Code Of Conduct form with Page 3. FILE THESE DOCUMENTS USING THE EVENT: Civil Events Other Filings Other Documents-Includes Social Security Transcript and Brief Events-Document Filed to avoid paying the filing fee twice. (pjr)
February 27, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Daniel Jacobson, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
February 27, 2018 Filing 27 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) filed by Daniel F Jacobson on behalf of League of Women Voters of Pennyslvania Attorney Daniel Jacobson is seeking special admission. Filing Fee: 50.00 Receipt Number: 111021760. (pjr)
February 26, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Aronchick, Mark)
February 26, 2018 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Aronchick, Mark)
February 26, 2018 Filing 24 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Phillip M Gordon on behalf of Jacob Corman, Michael Folmer Attorney Phillip Gordon is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4350028.. (Gordon, Phillip)
February 26, 2018 Filing 23 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Shawn Sheehy on behalf of Jacob Corman, Michael Folmer Attorney Shawn Sheehy is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4350011.. (Sheehy, Shawn)
February 26, 2018 Filing 22 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jason B Torchinsky on behalf of Jacob Corman, Michael Folmer Attorney Jason Torchinsky is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4349967.. (Torchinsky, Jason)
February 26, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Benjamin Geffen, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
February 26, 2018 Filing 21 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Benjamin D. Geffen on behalf of Gretchen Brandt, John Capowski, Jordi Comas, John Greiner, Lisa Issacs, Don Lancaster, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, League of Women Voters of Pennyslvania, Mark Lichty, Richard Mantell, William Marx, Robert McKinstry, Priscilla McNulty, Carmen Febo San Miguel, Lorraine Petrosky, Thomas Rentschler, Robert Smith, James Solomon, Thomas Ulrich Attorney Benjamin Geffen is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4349454.. (Geffen, Benjamin)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING motion 8 for leave to file amici curiae brief by by Brian McCann, et al., and movants shall file their proposed amici curiae brief to the docket in the above-captioned action on or before 3/2/18. (See order for complete details.) Signed by USCA 3rd Circuit Judge Kent A. Jordan, Chief Judge USDC MDPA Christopher C. Conner & District Judge USDC NJ Jerome B. Simandle on 2/23/18. (ki)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying pltfs' motion 3 as to request for TRO but DEFERRED as to request for prelim inj, directing that any opp to respective motions 5 12 to intervene be filed by noon on 2/27/28 & any reply in further supp of same to be filed by noon on 2/28/18, setting SCHEDULING HEARING on pltf's motion 3 for prelim inj & argument on respective motions 5 12 to intervene for 3/1/2018 @ 01:30 PM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 2, directing defts to file br in response to pltfs' motion 2 for prelim inj by close of business 3/2/18, directing that MTDs if any shall be filed w/ supp'ng brs by close of business 3/2/18 w/ brs in opp due by noon on 3/7/18 & setting PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING for 3/9/2018 @ 11:00 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 2. (See order for complete details.) Signed by USCA 3rd Circuit Judge Kent A. Jordan, Chief Judge USDC MDPA Christopher C. Conner & District Judge USDC NJ Jerome B. Simandle on 2/23/18. (ki)
February 23, 2018 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Michael Folmer, Jacob Corman. Jonathan M. Marks waiver sent on 2/23/2018, answer due 4/24/2018; Robert Torres waiver sent on 2/23/2018, answer due 4/24/2018. (Paszamant, Brian)
February 23, 2018 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jacob Corman, Michael Folmer.(Paszamant, Brian)
February 23, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file the brief in support of Doc. 3 as a separate entry using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)-Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). (pjr)
February 23, 2018 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORMS emailed to Attorney Gagne, Attorney Sheehy, Attorney Snyderman and Attorney Torchinsky (lg)
February 23, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele D. Hangley on behalf of Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres (Hangley, Michele)
February 23, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Aronchick on behalf of Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres (Aronchick, Mark)
February 23, 2018 Filing 14 EXHIBIT H, F & G filed by Thomas B. Schmidt, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G)(pjr)
February 23, 2018 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 12 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant filed by National Democratic Redistricting Committee.(Yu, Kay)
February 23, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by National Democratic Redistricting Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Answer in Intervention to Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order)(Yu, Kay)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER designating 3 Judge District Court pursuant to USC 2284 as follows: Kent A. Jordan, Circuit Judge, Christopher C. Conner, Chief District Judge, Jerome B. Simandle, District Judge, to hear & determine this cause in acc w/ the law. Circuit Judge Kent A. Jordan shall preside. The Clerk of the District Court shall process this order forthwith. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge D. Brooks Smith, USCA for 3rd Circuit on 2/23/18. (ki)
February 23, 2018 Filing 10 Letter from Thomas P. Howell . (Howell, Thomas)
February 23, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Paul Howell on behalf of Jonathan M. Marks, Robert Torres (Howell, Thomas)
February 22, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by Brian McCann.(Warren, Rebecca)
February 22, 2018 Filing 7 EXHIBITS re 6 Brief in Support filed by League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Carmen Febo San Miguel, James Solomon, John Greiner, John Capowski, Gretchen Brandt, Thomas Rentschler, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, Lisa Isaacs, Don Lancaster, Jordi Comas, Robert Smith, William Marx, Richard Mantell, Priscilla McNulty, Thomas Ulrich, Robert McKinstry, Mark Lichty and Lorraine Petrosky, Proposed Intervenors. (ve)
February 22, 2018 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 5 MOTION to Intervene filed by League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Carmen Febo San Miguel, James Solomon, John Greiner, John Capowski, Gretchen Brandt, Thomas Rentschler, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, Lisa Isaacs, Don Lancaster, Jordi Comas, Robert Smith, William Marx, Richard Mantell, Priscilla McNulty, Thomas Ulrich, Robert McKinstry, Mark Lichty and Lorraine Petrosky, Proposed Intervenors.(ve)
February 22, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants filed by League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Carmen Febo San Miguel, James Solomon, John Greiner, John Capowski, Gretchen Brandt, Thomas Rentschler, Mary Elizabeth Lawn, Lisa Isaacs, Don Lancaster, Jordi Comas, Robert Smith, William Marx, Richard Mantell, Priscilla McNulty, Thomas Ulrich, Robert McKinstry, Mark Lichty and Lorraine Petrosky, Proposed Intervenors. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ve)
February 22, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE Three Judge Court Request , filed by Jacob Corman, Michael Folmer.(Paszamant, Brian)
February 22, 2018 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jacob Corman, Michael Folmer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Memo)(Paszamant, Brian)
February 22, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: # 1 Summons Packet) (ve)
February 22, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4346608) filed by Scott Perry, Michael Folmer, Lou Barletta, Glenn Thompson, Keith Rothfus, Ryan Costello, Lloyd Smucker, Jacob Corman, Mike Kelly, Tom Marino. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit(s) Part 1 of 3, # 3 Exhibit(s) Part 2 of 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) Part 3 of 3)(ve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corman et al v. Torres et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Corman
Represented By: Phillip M Gordon
Represented By: Brian S. Paszamant
Represented By: Shawn Sheehy
Represented By: Michael D Silberfarb
Represented By: Jason A. Snyderman
Represented By: Jason B Torchinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Folmer
Represented By: Phillip M Gordon
Represented By: Brian S. Paszamant
Represented By: Shawn Sheehy
Represented By: Michael D Silberfarb
Represented By: Jason A. Snyderman
Represented By: Jason B Torchinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Barletta
Represented By: Paul G. Gagne
Represented By: Matthew H. Haverstick
Represented By: Brian S. Paszamant
Represented By: Mark E. Seiberling
Represented By: Shohin H. Vance
Represented By: Joshua John Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Costello
Represented By: Paul G. Gagne
Represented By: Matthew H. Haverstick
Represented By: Brian S. Paszamant
Represented By: Mark E. Seiberling
Represented By: Shohin H. Vance
Represented By: Joshua John Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Kelly
Represented By: Paul G. Gagne
Represented By: Matthew H. Haverstick
Represented By: Brian S. Paszamant
Represented By: Mark E. Seiberling
Represented By: Shohin H. Vance
Represented By: Joshua John Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Marino
Represented By: Paul G. Gagne
Represented By: Matthew H. Haverstick
Represented By: Brian S. Paszamant
Represented By: Mark E. Seiberling
Represented By: Shohin H. Vance
Represented By: Joshua John Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Perry
Represented By: Paul G. Gagne
Represented By: Matthew H. Haverstick
Represented By: Brian S. Paszamant
Represented By: Mark E. Seiberling
Represented By: Shohin H. Vance
Represented By: Joshua John Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Rothfus
Represented By: Paul G. Gagne
Represented By: Matthew H. Haverstick
Represented By: Brian S. Paszamant
Represented By: Mark E. Seiberling
Represented By: Shohin H. Vance
Represented By: Joshua John Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Smucker
Represented By: Paul G. Gagne
Represented By: Matthew H. Haverstick
Represented By: Brian S. Paszamant
Represented By: Mark E. Seiberling
Represented By: Shohin H. Vance
Represented By: Joshua John Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Thompson
Represented By: Paul G. Gagne
Represented By: Matthew H. Haverstick
Represented By: Brian S. Paszamant
Represented By: Mark E. Seiberling
Represented By: Shohin H. Vance
Represented By: Joshua John Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Torres
Represented By: Mark A. Aronchick
Represented By: Timothy E. Gates
Represented By: Michele D. Hangley
Represented By: Thomas Paul Howell
Represented By: Neal Katyal
Represented By: Kathleen M Kotula
Represented By: Mitchell P Reich
Represented By: Colleen E Roh Sinzdak
Represented By: Thomas P Schmidt
Represented By: Sara A Solow
Represented By: Reedy C Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan M. Marks
Represented By: Mark A. Aronchick
Represented By: Timothy E. Gates
Represented By: Michele D. Hangley
Represented By: Thomas Paul Howell
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Neal Katyal
Represented By: Mitchell P Reich
Represented By: Colleen E Roh Sinzdak
Represented By: Thomas P Schmidt
Represented By: Sara A Solow
Represented By: Reedy C Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Brian McCann
Represented By: Rebecca L Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Democratic Redistricting Committee
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Caitlin M Foley
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Brian S Marshall
Represented By: Uzoma Nkwonta
Represented By: Bruce V Spiva
Represented By: Kay Kyungsun Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: League of Women Voters of Pennyslvania
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Republican Caucus of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives
Represented By: Rodney A. Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Common Cause
Represented By: Thomas James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Campaign Legal Center
Represented By: Ruth M Greenwood
Represented By: Annabelle E Harless
Represented By: Paul M. Smith
Represented By: Joshua D. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Susan American Civil Rights Union
Represented By: Linda Ann Kerns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Guy Reschenthaler
Represented By: Guy Reschenthaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Carmen Febo San Miguel
Represented By: Andrew D Bergman
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Elisabeth S Theodore
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: James Solomon
Represented By: Andrew D Bergman
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Elisabeth S Theodore
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: John Greiner
Represented By: Andrew D Bergman
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Elisabeth S Theodore
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: John Capowski
Represented By: Andrew D Bergman
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Elisabeth S Theodore
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Gretchen Brandt
Represented By: Andrew D Bergman
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Elisabeth S Theodore
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Thomas Rentschler
Represented By: Andrew D Bergman
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Elisabeth S Theodore
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Mary Elizabeth Lawn
Represented By: Andrew D Bergman
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Elisabeth S Theodore
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Lisa Issacs
Represented By: Andrew D Bergman
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Elisabeth S Theodore
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Don Lancaster
Represented By: Andrew D Bergman
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Elisabeth S Theodore
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Jordi Comas
Represented By: Andrew D Bergman
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Elisabeth S Theodore
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Robert Smith
Represented By: Andrew D Bergman
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Elisabeth S Theodore
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: William Marx
Represented By: Andrew D Bergman
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Elisabeth S Theodore
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Richard Mantell
Represented By: Andrew D Bergman
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Elisabeth S Theodore
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Priscilla McNulty
Represented By: Andrew D Bergman
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Elisabeth S Theodore
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Thomas Ulrich
Represented By: Andrew D Bergman
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Elisabeth S Theodore
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Robert McKinstry
Represented By: Andrew D Bergman
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Elisabeth S Theodore
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Mark Lichty
Represented By: Andrew D Bergman
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Elisabeth S Theodore
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Lorraine Petrosky
Represented By: Andrew D Bergman
Represented By: Michael Churchill
Represented By: Benjamin D. Geffen
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Mary M McKenzie
Represented By: Sara K Murphy
Represented By: Thomas B. Schmidt, III
Represented By: Elisabeth S Theodore
Represented By: Justin G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?