Farmers and Merchants Trust Company of Chambersburg v. Urner

Plaintiff: Farmers and Merchants Trust Company of Chambersburg
Defendant: John H. Urner, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01662
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald M. Lewis, III on behalf of John H. Urner, Jr. (Lewis, Donald)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Farmers and Merchants Trust Company of Chambersburg. John H. Urner, Jr waiver sent on 8/22/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Moniak, Stephen)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd J. Shill on behalf of Farmers and Merchants Trust Company of Chambersburg (Shill, Todd)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Farmers and Merchants Trust Company of Chambersburg identifying Corporate Parent Franklin Financial Services Corporation for Farmers and Merchants Trust Company of Chambersburg. (Moniak, Stephen)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Letter to Counsel from Court Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 8/22/18. (ki)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John H. Urner, Jr and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John H. Urner, Jr ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4521527) filed by Farmers and Merchants Trust Company of Chambersburg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmers and Merchants Trust Company of Chambersburg v. Urner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Urner, Jr.
Represented By: Donald M. Lewis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers and Merchants Trust Company of Chambersburg
Represented By: Stephen Moniak
Represented By: Todd J. Shill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?