Farmers & Merchants Trust Company, Trustee of the Verna H. Shultz Trust v. American Towers LLC

Plaintiff: Farmers & Merchants Trust Company, Trustee of the Verna H. Shultz Trust
Counter Plaintiff: American Towers LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01779
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counterclaim) filed by Farmers & Merchants Trust Company, Trustee of the Verna H. Shultz Trust.(French, Thomas)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counterclaim) by Farmers & Merchants Trust Company, Trustee of the Verna H. Shultz Trust. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(French, Thomas)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: A Case Management conference will be conducted by the court on December 7, 2018 at 9:30 a m. The court prefers to hold this conference by telephone. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate this telephone conference. The telephone number of the court is 717-221-3990. Counsel should be prepared to address any pending motions at the conference. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/7/2018. (ve)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint with, COUNTERCLAIM against Farmers & Merchants Trust Company, Trustee of the Verna H. Shultz Trust by American Towers LLC.(Lipman, Matthew)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Towers LLC, filed by Farmers & Merchants Trust Company, Trustee of the Verna H. Shultz Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s))(French, Thomas)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 COUNTY COURT RECORD from Cumberland County Court of Common Please. (rw)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Farmers & Merchants Trust Company, Trustee of the Verna H. Shultz Trust identifying Corporate Parent Franklin Financial Services Corporation for Farmers & Merchants Trust Company, Trustee of the Verna H. Shultz Trust. (French, Thomas)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by American Towers LLC identifying Corporate Parent American Tower Corporation for American Towers LLC. (Lipman, Matthew)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by American Towers LLC.(Lipman, Matthew)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Judge Yvette Kane on 9/17/18. (ve)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Towers LLC from Cumberland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-07626. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4538347), filed by American Towers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmers & Merchants Trust Company, Trustee of the Verna H. Shultz Trust v. American Towers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers & Merchants Trust Company, Trustee of the Verna H. Shultz Trust
Represented By: Thomas A. French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: American Towers LLC
Represented By: Matthew A. Lipman
Represented By: Emily A Cathcart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?