Beard et al v. Norfolk Southern Railway Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Charles A. Beard and Debra Beard
Defendant: UPS Ground Freight, Inc., UPS Freight and Norfolk Southern Railway Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01801
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
0 Judge: John E Jones
1 Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Norfolk Southern Railway Corporation.(Staudenmaier, Craig)
October 4, 2018 10 NOTICE/LETTER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/4/18. (ma)
October 2, 2018 9 DISCLOSURE REPORT. (Olley, Michael)
September 28, 2018 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by UPS Freight, UPS Ground Freight, Inc.. (Wescoe, James)
September 20, 2018 7 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Michael Olley, Esquire on behalf of plaintiffsSigned by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 9/20/18. (ma)
September 20, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Michael Olley and Associate Counsel Lawrence Katz - bar status verified. (dmn)
September 20, 2018 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Michael J Olley on behalf of Charles A. Beard, Debra Beard Attorney Michael J. Olley is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4547604.. (Olley, Michael)
September 20, 2018 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on UPS Freight on September 17, 2018, filed by Charles A. Beard, Debra Beard. (Olley, Michael)
September 20, 2018 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on UPS Ground Freight, Inc. on September 17, 2018, filed by Charles A. Beard, Debra Beard. (Olley, Michael)
September 20, 2018 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Deft. Norfolk Southern on September 17, 2018, filed by Charles A. Beard, Debra Beard. (Olley, Michael)
September 14, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: The Honorable Sylvia Rambo assigned to this case. (pjr)
September 13, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Corporation, UPS Freight, UPS Ground Freight, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
September 13, 2018 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for Robert E. Myers can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr)
September 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Corporation, UPS Freight, UPS Ground Freight, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4541104) filed by Debra Beard, Charles A. Beard.(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beard et al v. Norfolk Southern Railway Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. Beard
Represented By: Robert E. Myers
Represented By: Lawrence A. Katz
Represented By: Michael J Olley
Represented By: Robert Earl Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Beard
Represented By: Robert E. Myers
Represented By: Lawrence A. Katz
Represented By: Michael J Olley
Represented By: Robert Earl Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS Ground Freight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS Freight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Corporation
Represented By: Craig J. Staudenmaier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?