Dye et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Elke Loquai-Dye and Leonard Dye
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01802
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2018 7 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/28/2018 10:00 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Counsel are advised to see attached calendar for dates that must be used when selecting a trial term. (eo)
October 25, 2018 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Reeser, Christopher)
October 25, 2018 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Reeser, Christopher)
October 19, 2018 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Leonard Dye. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company waiver sent on 10/17/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Lutz, David)
October 17, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Reeser on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Reeser, Christopher)
September 13, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
September 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4541133) filed by Leonard Dye, Elke Loquai-Dye.(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dye et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elke Loquai-Dye
Represented By: David L. Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Dye
Represented By: David L. Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?