Drees v. Stevens & Lee, P.C.

Plaintiff: Alicia Drees
Defendant: Stevens & Lee, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01823
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Answer To Complaint WIth Affirmative Defenses by Stevens & Lee, P.C..(Hofmann, Joseph)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/28/2018 10:30 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Counsel are advised to see attached calendar for dates that must be used when selecting a trial term. (eo)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Alicia Drees. Stevens & Lee, P.C. waiver sent on 9/18/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Dorrance, Bradford)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Stevens & Lee, P.C. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stevens & Lee, P.C. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4544471) filed by Alicia Drees. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drees v. Stevens & Lee, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Drees
Represented By: Bradford Dorrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens & Lee, P.C.
Represented By: Joseph P. Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?