Keo v. Maple Donuts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: La'Keya Keo
Defendant: Charles Burnside and Maple Donuts, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01953
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sunshine J. Thomas on behalf of All Defendants (Thomas, Sunshine)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill M. Lashay on behalf of All Defendants (Lashay, Jill)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by La'Keya Keo. Charles Burnside waiver sent on 11/12/2018, answer due 1/11/2019; Maple Donuts, Inc. waiver sent on 11/12/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (Miller, Matthew)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/6/2018. (ve)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Charles Burnside, Maple Donuts, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4566070) filed by La'Keya Keo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keo v. Maple Donuts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La'Keya Keo
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Matthew D. Miller
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Burnside
Represented By: Sunshine J. Thomas
Represented By: Jill M. Lashay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maple Donuts, Inc.
Represented By: Sunshine J. Thomas
Represented By: Jill M. Lashay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?